EP2079245 - ACCESS GATEWAY DEVICE AND TRACKING AREA IDENTIFIER NOTIFYING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAMURA, Mikio Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo, Inc. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
ISHII, Minami Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo, Inc. SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07830795.6 | 29.10.2007 | [2009/29] | WO2007JP71061 | Priority number, date | JP20060297051 | 31.10.2006 Original published format: JP 2006297051 | [2009/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008053855 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2079245 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/16, // H04W60/00 | [2016/22] | CPC: |
H04W88/16 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/66 (KR);
H04W60/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/24] | H04W60/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/31] | H04W24/00, H04L12/56 | ||
Former IPC [2009/29] | H04Q7/34, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | ZUGANGS-GATEWAY-EINRICHTUNG UND TRACKING-BEREICHIDENTIFIZIERERMITTEILUNGSVERFAHREN | [2009/29] | English: | ACCESS GATEWAY DEVICE AND TRACKING AREA IDENTIFIER NOTIFYING METHOD | [2009/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PASSERELLE D'ACCÈS ET PROCÉDÉ DE NOTIFICATION D'IDENTIFIANT DE ZONE DE SUIVI | [2009/29] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2009 | Translation filed | 07.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/29] | 06.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/13] | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9966740 (EINOLA HEIKKI [FI], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0009] - [0010] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0033] ** paragraph [0047] *; | [XYI]US6101388 (KESHAVACHAR BHAKTHA [US]) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 13 - column 2, line 6 * * column 3, lines 40-47 * * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 6 * * column 4, lines 31-35 * * column 4, lines 53-57 * * column 5, lines 45-62 * * figures 3-5 * [Y] 2,3,6 [I] 4,5; | [XYI]US2006025160 (KODALI SANJAY K [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] * * paragraphs [0038] - [0063] * * paragraph [0077] * [Y] 6 [I] 2-5; | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; General Packet Radio Service (GPRS); Service description; Stage 2 (Release 7)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 23.060, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060901), no. V7.2.0, pages 1 - 214, XP050362313 [Y] 2,3,6 * pages 69-72, paragraph 6.9.1.3.2 * | International search | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Rationale and track of security decisions in Long Term Evolved RAN/3GPP System Architecture Evolution (Release 7)", 3GPP DOCUMENT, V0.0.2, 3GPP INTERNATIONAL PARTNERS, (200604), pages 6 - 13, XP050131061 | [A] - SIEMENS, "Roaming/Area Restrictions for LTE", 3GPP JOINT TSG RAN WG2 - WG3 MEETING #49, (20051107), vol. R2-052910, pages 1 - 3, XP050129891 | [A] - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, "Random Access usage for RRC state transistions and mobility support", 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 MEETING #52, (20060327), vol. R2-061071, pages 1 - 4, XP050131050 | [A] - LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES, "Signalling of UE capability", 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 #54, (20060828), vol. R2-062232, pages 1 - 3, XP050131840 | [A] - ERICSSON, "Early User-Plane Transmission", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 #54, TDOC, (20060828), vol. R2-062129, pages 1 - 4, XP050131749 | [A] - NTT DOCOMO, INC., "Initial Access Procedure in LTE", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG2 #55, (20061009), vol. R2-062911, pages 1 - 4, XP050132429 | Examination | - SIEMENS, "Roaming/Area Restrictions for LTE", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-052910_ROAMING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20051102), vol. RAN WG2, no. Seoul, Korea; 20051102, XP050129891 | by applicant | TR25813 | JP2006297051 |