EP2127984 - Control method of hybrid vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/49] | METHOD OF CONTROLLING HYBRID VEHICLE | ||
[2016/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Corporation 6-7, Shibuya 3-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-8360 / JP | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IMASEKI, Takashi c/o Bosch Corporation 9-1 Ushikubo 3-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8501 / JP | 02 /
MIYANO, Takashi c/o Bosch Corporation 9-1 Ushikubo 3-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8501 / JP | 03 /
SCHOECHE, Nils c/o Bosch Corporation 9-1 Ushikubo 3-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8501 / JP | [2016/33] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
IMASEKI, Takashi c/o Bosch Corporation 9-1 Ushikubo 3-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8501 / JP | ||
02 /
MIYANO, Takashi c/o Bosch Corporation 9-1 Ushikubo 3-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8501 / JP | |||
03 /
SCHOECHE, Nils c/o Bosch Corporation 9-1 Ushikubo 3-chome Tsuzuki-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 224-8501 / JP | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [2016/33] |
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2013/30] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Knapp, Thomas Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07831222.0 | 05.11.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007JP71490 | Priority number, date | JP20060351289 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006351289 | [2009/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008078459 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2127984 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2127984 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60W20/00, B60K6/44, B60K6/442, B60K6/52, B60K6/543, B60L11/14, B60W10/02, B60W10/04, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W10/10, F02D29/00, F02D29/02, F02D29/06, F16D48/02, B60K6/36, B60K6/448, // B60W50/00 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
B60W10/107 (EP,US);
B60K6/36 (EP,US);
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/442 (EP,US);
B60K6/448 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60K6/485 (EP,US);
B60K6/52 (EP,US);
B60K6/543 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L58/24 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,US);
B60W10/04 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60W30/192 (EP,US);
F02D29/02 (EP,US);
F02D29/06 (EP,US);
F02N11/04 (EP,US);
B60K2006/268 (EP);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/486 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0096 (EP,US);
B60W2510/1015 (EP,US);
B60W2510/102 (US);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W2510/246 (EP,US);
B60W2520/10 (EP,US);
B60W2710/025 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0644 (US);
B60W2710/083 (EP,US);
B60W2710/1011 (EP,US);
F02N2011/0896 (EP,US);
F02N2200/061 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1066 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1088 (EP,US);
F16D2500/30406 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70426 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/49] | B60W20/00, B60K6/44, B60K6/442, B60K6/52, B60K6/543, B60L11/14, B60W10/02, B60W10/04, B60W10/06, B60W10/08, B60W10/10, F02D29/00, F02D29/02, F02D29/06, F16D48/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung von Hybridfahrzeugen | [2016/17] | English: | Control method of hybrid vehicles | [2016/17] | French: | Procédé de commande des véhicules hybrides automobiles | [2016/17] |
Former [2009/49] | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES HYBRIDFAHRZEUGS | ||
Former [2009/49] | METHOD OF CONTROLLING HYBRID VEHICLE | ||
Former [2009/49] | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER UN VÉHICULE HYBRIDE | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2009 | Translation filed | 27.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 26.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.11.2007 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | IT | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | IE | 05.11.2016 | MT | 05.11.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 05.11.2007 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.11.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.11.2007 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.11.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.11.2007 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.11.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 05.11.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2006335196 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 4-6,8-10,12-15 * abstract *; | [Y]US6083139 (DEGUCHI YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 4,6,10 * column 2, line 36 - column 6, line 11 *; | [Y]EP1020640 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 4-6,8-10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0012] - [0027] *; | [Y]US2002050259 (KOJIMA MASAKIYO [JP]) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0037] - [0053]; figures 2,6-7b *; | [Y]US2003109360 (EGUCHI TAKAHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0035] *; | [Y]DE4134268 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 4 * column 3, lines 33-50 *; | [Y]US2001016165 (SHIMABUKURO EIJIROU [JP], et al) [Y] 12-15 * figure 1 * | International search | [X]JP2006335196 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2002089688 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2005297727 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2004175320 (EQUOS RES CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005053402 (NISSAN MOTOR) | by applicant | JP2006160104 | JP2003237383 | JP2000255279 | JP2004308913 |