EP2084752 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SUBSTRATE PROVIDED WITH A TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE FILM FOR THIN FILM SOLAR CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/32] | SUBSTRATE PROVIDED WITH TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE FILM FOR PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SUBSTRATE, AND PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE USING THE SUBSTRATE | ||
[2016/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka / JP | [2016/33] |
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima, Kita-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAWADA, Yuko KANEKA CORPORATION 2-1-1, Hieitsuji Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0104 / JP | [2016/33] |
Former [2009/32] | 01 /
TAWADA, Yuko KANEKA CORPORATION 2-1-1, Hieitsuji Otsu-shi Shiga 520-0104 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/33] |
Former [2009/32] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstraße 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07831632.0 | 12.11.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007JP71902 | Priority number, date | JP20060313336 | 20.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006313336 | [2009/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008062685 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2084752 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/32] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2084752 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | [2009/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2084752 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/0224, H01L31/0236, H01L31/18, C23C14/08, C23C16/40 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
H01L31/0236 (EP,US);
C23C14/086 (EP,US);
C23C16/407 (EP,US);
H01L31/022466 (EP,US);
H01L31/02366 (EP,US);
H01L31/1884 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/42] | C23C14/08, C23C16/40, H01L31/0236, H01L31/18, H01L31/0224 | ||
Former IPC [2009/32] | H01L31/04, C23C14/08, C23C16/40, H01L31/042 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2009/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MIT EINER TRANSPARENTEN LEITFÄHIGEN SCHICHT AUSGESTATTETEN SUBSTRATS FÜR DÜNNSCHICHTSOLARZELLEN | [2016/13] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A SUBSTRATE PROVIDED WITH A TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE FILM FOR THIN FILM SOLAR CELLS | [2016/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D' UN SUBSTRAT AVEC UNE COUCHE CONDUCTRICE TRANSPARENTE POUR CELLULES SOLAIRES À BASE DE COUCHES MINCES | [2016/13] |
Former [2009/32] | MIT EINEM TRANSPARENTEN LEITFÄHIGEN FILM AUSGESTATTETES SUBSTRAT FÜR EINE FOTOELEKTRISCHE WANDLEREINRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES SUBSTRATS UND DAS SUBSTRAT VERWENDENDE FOTOELEKTRISCHE WANDLEREINRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2009/32] | SUBSTRATE PROVIDED WITH TRANSPARENT CONDUCTIVE FILM FOR PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE, METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SUBSTRATE, AND PHOTOELECTRIC CONVERSION DEVICE USING THE SUBSTRATE | ||
Former [2009/32] | SUBSTRAT ACCOMPAGNE DE FILM CONDUCTEUR TRANSPARENT POUR DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION PHOTOELECTRIQUE, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DU SUBSTRAT ET DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION PHOTOELECTRIQUE L'UTILISANT | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2009 | Translation filed | 19.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 12.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.11.2007 | AT | 17.08.2016 | BE | 17.08.2016 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | DK | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | ES | 17.08.2016 | FI | 17.08.2016 | IS | 17.08.2016 | IT | 17.08.2016 | LT | 17.08.2016 | LV | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | NL | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | SE | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | IE | 12.11.2016 | MT | 12.11.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | FR | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 12.11.2007 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IS | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.11.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.11.2007 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
TR | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.11.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.11.2007 | |
AT | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.11.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
IE | 12.11.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
FR | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
DK | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
BE | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LV | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | AT | 17.08.2016 | |
ES | 17.08.2016 | ||
FI | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
SE | 17.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 17.08.2016 | |
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
LT | 17.08.2016 | ||
NL | 17.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002134425 (YAMAMOTO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4 * paragraphs [0011] , [0013] , [0033] , [0038] , [0 45] , [0 48] , [0 66] , [0 93] - [0096]; figures 1-3 * [I] 2,3,5; | [IY]JP3196155B (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [I] 1,2,4,5 * paragraphs [0017] , [0 18] , [0 20] , [0 22] , [0 28]; figures 1-3; table 1 * [Y] 3; | [I]US5078803 (PIER DAVID N [US], et al) [I] 1,2,4,5 * column 9, lines 11-46; figure 1; example 2 *; | [A]WO2005071131 (FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM JUELICH GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 2, paragraphs 2-4 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 2 *; | [YA]WO2005093854 (KANEKA CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0040]; figures 1-5 * [A] 1,2,5; | [P]EP1732139 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] - [0 29] - [0040]; figures 1-5 * | [A] - STIEBIG H ET AL, "LIGHT SCATTERING IN MICRO CRYSTALLINE SILICON THIN FILM SOLAR CELLS", 16TH. E.C. PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE. GLASCOW, UNITED KINGDOM, MAY 1 - 5, 2000; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL PHOTOVOLTAIC SOLAR ENERGY CONFERENCE], LONDON : JAMES & JAMES LTD, GB, (20000501), vol. CONF. 16, ISBN 978-1-902916-18-7, pages 549 - 552, XP001138361 [A] 1,2 * page 549, column left, paragraph 2; figure 2; table 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2005311292 (KANEKA CORP); | [A]JP2004311704 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JPH11233800 (SHARP KK); | [A]JPH07131044 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000294812 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) | [Y] - NAKADA T., ET AL., "Textured ZnO:Al films for solar cells by DC-magnatron sputtering in water vapor plasma", CONF REC IEEE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPEC CONF, 22ND, (1991), vol. 2, pages 1389 - 1392, XP010039138 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PVSC.1991.169435 | by applicant | JP2005311292 | JP2000252500 |