EP2117096 - ELECTRIC/ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT SYSTEM WITH CONDUCTIVE GLASS MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokai Industry Corp. 3-15-3 Chofugaoka Chofu-city Tokyo 182-0021 / JP | [2009/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANABE, Kazumi TOKAI INDUSTRY CORP. 3-15-3, Chofugaoka Chofu-city Tokyo 182-0021 / JP | 02 /
MORISHIGE, Akira TOKAI INDUSTRY CORP. 3-15-3, Chofugaoka Chofu-city Tokyo 182-0021 / JP | 03 /
MANABE, Takeshi TOKAI INDUSTRY CORP. 3-15-3, Chofugaoka Chofu-city Tokyo 182-0021 / JP | 04 /
MATSUSHITA, Mitsugi TOKAI INDUSTRY CORP. 3-15-3, Chofugaoka Chofu-city Tokyo 182-0021 / JP | 05 /
KOBAYASHI, Kenichi 6-34-3, Nagasaki Toshima-ku Tokyo 171-0051 / JP | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Giovannini, Francesca Osha Liang 32, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Giovannini, Francesca Osha Liang 32, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07831763.3 | 13.11.2007 | [2009/46] | WO2007JP72033 | Priority number, date | JP20060306648 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006306648 | WO2007JP65400 | 07.08.2007 Original published format: PCT/JP2007/065400 | [2009/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008059847 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2117096 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/02, C03C3/12, C03C4/14 | [2009/46] | CPC: |
C03C3/122 (EP,US);
C03C3/12 (KR);
C03C3/14 (KR);
C03C4/14 (EP,US);
H02H9/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/46] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES/ELEKTRONISCHES SCHALTUNGSSYSTEM MIT LEITFÄHIGEM GLASGLIED | [2009/46] | English: | ELECTRIC/ELECTRONIC CIRCUIT SYSTEM WITH CONDUCTIVE GLASS MEMBER | [2009/46] | French: | SYSTEME DE CIRCUIT ELECTRIQUE/ELECTRONIQUE AVEC ELEMENT EN VERRE CONDUCTEUR | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2009 | Translation filed | 11.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 11.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 18.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/44] | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 22.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS58142869 (RICOH KK) [X] 1,9 * the whole document * [Y] 2-8,11,12; | [Y]JP2006248867 (KITAKYUSHU FOUNDATION, et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraph [0026]; claims 1-3 *; | [Y]JP2000340126 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0007] , [0016] - [0023]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]WO9952184 (ARGUS PHOTONICS GROUP INC [US]) [A] 7 * page 6, lines 21-25 *; | [XPL]CN2914558Y | [XY] - HIGGINS J K ET AL, "Preparation of vanadate-glass threshold switches", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PHYSICS PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0022-3093(75)90009-5, vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3093, (19750701), pages 77 - 93, (19750701), XP025462387 [X] 1-3,6,11,12 * pages 81,82, paragraph 2.2; figure 3 * [Y] 4,5,7-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(75)90009-5 | [XPL] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 54, Database accession no. 2008-J28984, XP002599826 & CN2914558Y Y 20070620 (UNIV WUHAN) [XP] 1 * abstract * [L] | International search | [Y]JP2000340126 (KOBE STEEL LTD); | [Y]JP2006248867 (KITAKYUSHU FOUNDATION, et al); | [Y]JP2002510883 ; | [Y]JP2004055362 (HAIDEN KENKYUSHO KK); | [Y]JPH01309328 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD); | [A]JPH11106531 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2003034548 | JP2004002181 | JP2006248867 | JP2004331416 |