EP2095939 - COMPOSITE SHEET AND ABSORBENT ARTICLE COMPRISING COMPOSITE SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, MT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states Uni-Charm Corporation 182, Shimobun Kinseicho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Tatsuya Technical Center, Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 02 /
MUKAI, Hirotomo Technical Center, Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 03 /
MITSUNO, Satoshi Technical Center, Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 04 /
TSUJI, Tomoko Technical Center, Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | 05 /
AKAKI, Kenichi Technical Center, Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | [2015/30] |
Former [2009/36] | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Tatsuya Technical Center, Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | ||
02 /
MUKAI, Hirotomo Technical Center, Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | |||
03 /
MITSUNO, Satoshi Technical Center, Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | |||
04 /
TSUJI, Tomoko Technical Center, Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | |||
05 /
AKAKI, Kenichi Technical Center, Uni-Charm Corporation 1531-7, Wadahama Toyohama-cho Kanonji-shi Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/30] | Eke, Philippa Dianne, et al Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | ||
Former [2012/42] | Eke, Philippa Dianne, et al Saunders & Dolleymore LLP 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | ||
Former [2009/36] | Fitchett, Stuart Paul Saunders & Dolleymore LLP European Patent Attorneys 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford WD18 0JU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07832510.7 | 26.11.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007JP72785 | Priority number, date | JP20060319608 | 28.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006319608 | [2009/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008066009 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2095939 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2095939 | Date: | 22.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/26, B32B5/08, B32B5/14, B32B3/30, B32B3/28, B32B7/14, B32B5/04, // A61F13/49, A61F13/511, A61F13/514, D04H13/00 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
B32B3/30 (EP,KR,US);
D04H13/00 (KR);
A61F13/49009 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/4902 (EP,KR,US);
A61F13/514 (KR);
B32B3/28 (EP,KR,US);
B32B5/04 (EP,US);
B32B5/08 (EP,US);
B32B5/14 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,KR,US);
B32B7/14 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/593 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/2457 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24595 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24603 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24678 (EP,US);
Y10T442/601 (EP,US);
Y10T442/602 (EP,US);
Y10T442/659 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/36] | B32B5/26, A61F13/49, A61F13/511, A61F13/514, D04H1/54 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/30] |
Former [2009/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBUNDLAGE UND DIE VERBUNDLAGE UMFASSENDER ABSORBIERFÄHIGER ARTIKEL | [2009/36] | English: | COMPOSITE SHEET AND ABSORBENT ARTICLE COMPRISING COMPOSITE SHEET | [2009/36] | French: | FEUILLE COMPOSITE ET ARTICLE ABSORBANT COMPRENANT LADITE FEUILLE | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2009 | Translation filed | 19.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 06.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2007 | AT | 22.07.2015 | BE | 22.07.2015 | BG | 22.07.2015 | CY | 22.07.2015 | CZ | 22.07.2015 | DK | 22.07.2015 | EE | 22.07.2015 | ES | 22.07.2015 | FI | 22.07.2015 | IT | 22.07.2015 | LT | 22.07.2015 | LV | 22.07.2015 | MC | 22.07.2015 | MT | 22.07.2015 | PL | 22.07.2015 | RO | 22.07.2015 | SI | 22.07.2015 | SK | 22.07.2015 | TR | 22.07.2015 | GR | 23.10.2015 | IS | 22.11.2015 | PT | 23.11.2015 | IE | 26.11.2015 | LU | 26.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
BE | 22.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
IE | 26.11.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
IE | 26.11.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SI | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
LU | 26.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
MC | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
RO | 22.07.2015 | ||
SK | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
CZ | 22.07.2015 | ||
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
EE | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
IT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
DK | 22.07.2015 | ||
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 22.07.2015 | |
ES | 22.07.2015 | ||
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 22.07.2015 | |
FI | 22.07.2015 | ||
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
PL | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
IS | 22.11.2015 | ||
PT | 23.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 22.07.2015 | |
LT | 22.07.2015 | ||
LV | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 22.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1589140 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) [I] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0107] *; | [A]EP1591574 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0102] *; | [E]EP2022879 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [E] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0095] ** paragraph [0153] * | International search | [Y]JPH0737703B ; | [Y]JP2004244791 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC, et al); | [Y]JP2004244790 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC, et al); | [A]JP2004330692 (LIVEDO CORP) | by applicant | EP1589140 | JP2006089907 |