EP2091042 - INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM AND MASTER EXPOSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 1-23, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8415 / JP | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASAKI, Hidehiro Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 1-23, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8415 / JP | 02 /
KUBO, Masae Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 1-23, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8415 / JP | 03 /
KIYONO, Kenjirou Mitsubishi Kagaku Media Co., Ltd. 1-23, Shiba 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8415 / JP | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Merkle, Gebhard TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07832706.1 | 28.11.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007JP72984 | Priority number, date | JP20060324452 | 30.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006324452 | JP20070073272 | 20.03.2007 Original published format: JP 2007073272 | [2009/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008069078 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2091042 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/26 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
G11B7/24079 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/00736 (EP,US);
G11B7/244 (KR);
G11B7/261 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM UND MASTER-BELICHTUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2009/34] | English: | INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM AND MASTER EXPOSING DEVICE | [2009/34] | French: | SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET DISPOSITIF D'EXPOSITION MAÎTRE | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.05.2009 | Translation filed | 08.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 22.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.04.2019 | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/30] | 03.04.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.04.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0518213 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) [Y] 8,25* figure 1 *; | [XY]EP1345219 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-7,9-24 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 2-4 * [Y] 8,25; | [I]US2004001414 (KADOWAKI SHIN-ICHI [JP], et al) [I] 1,20 * paragraph [0188] - paragraph [0212] * * figure 5 * | International search | [Y]JPS63103454 (PHILIPS NV); | [Y]JPH05198012 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS); | [Y]JPH10198961 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2002092890 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [A]JP2003346384 (SONY CORP) | Examination | EP1302937 | WO2006120591 | - "Blu-ray Disc Recordable Format. Part 1: Physical Specifications", INTERNET CITATION, (20060201), page 33pp, URL: http://www.blu-raydisc.com/Assets/Downloadablefile/BD-R_Physical_3rd_edition_0602f1-15268.pdf, (20100225), XP007911940 | by applicant | JPS57187604 | JP2003346384 | JP2006012355 | JP2006324452 | JP2007073272 |