EP2091306 - SPIN-POLARIZATION ION BEAM GENERATOR, SCATTERING SPECTROSCOPE USING THE SPIN-POLARIZATION ION BEAM, AND SPECIMEN PROCESSING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.06.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.07.2017 [2017/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 4-1-8, Hon-cho Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Taku NATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR MATERIALS SCIENCE 1-2-1, Sengen Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0047 / JP | 02 /
YAMAUCHI, Yasushi NATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR MATERIALS SCIENCE 1-2-1, Sengen Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0047 / JP | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/34] | Behnisch, Werner Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07832821.8 | 29.11.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007JP73121 | Priority number, date | JP20060321044 | 29.11.2006 Original published format: JP 2006321044 | JP20070190277 | 23.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007190277 | [2009/34] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008069110 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2091306 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01J27/18, H01J27/24, G01R33/28, H01J37/08, // H01J37/252 | [2016/26] | CPC: |
H01J27/24 (EP,US);
G01R33/282 (EP,US);
H01J27/18 (EP,US);
H01J37/08 (EP,US);
H01J2237/0815 (EP,US);
H01J2237/24557 (EP,US);
H01J2237/25 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | H05H1/46, G01N27/64, H01J27/24, H01J37/08, H01J37/252 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | SPIN-POLARISATIONS-IONENSTRAHLGENERATOR, STREUSPEKTROSKOP MIT DEM SPIN-POLARISATIONS-IONENSTRAHL UND PROBENVERARBEITUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2009/34] | English: | SPIN-POLARIZATION ION BEAM GENERATOR, SCATTERING SPECTROSCOPE USING THE SPIN-POLARIZATION ION BEAM, AND SPECIMEN PROCESSING DEVICE | [2009/34] | French: | GÉNÉRATEUR DE FAISCEAU IONIQUE À POLARISATION EN SPIN, SPECTROSCOPE DE DIFFUSION UTILISANT LE FAISCEAU IONIQUE À POLARISATION EN SPIN ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'ÉCHANTILLON | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2009 | Translation filed | 04.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 03.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/27] | 08.02.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP] - SUZUKI ET AL, "Generation of polarized 4He+ ion beam by optical pumping using circularly and linearly polarized radiation tuned to D0 line (He metastables 2<3>S1->2<3>P0)", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS, AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, ELSEVIER BV * NORTH-HOLLAND, NL, (20070505), vol. 575, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.NIMA.2007.03.003, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 343 - 346, XP022062224 [XP] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nima.2007.03.003 | [XP] - TAKU SUZUKI ET AL, "Spin Polarization Measurement of Metastable He 2 3 S1 Atoms in He Discharge", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JP, (20070606), vol. 46, no. 6A, doi:10.1143/JJAP.46.3673, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 3673 - 3675, XP055272279 [XP] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.46.3673 | [XP] - SUZUKI ET AL, "Spin-polarized ion scattering spectroscopy as a novel analytical method of magnetic structure at outermost surfaces", SURFACE SCIENCE, NORTH-HOLLAND, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071117), vol. 602, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.SUSC.2007.11.004, ISSN 0039-6028, pages 579 - 583, XP022426303 [XP] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.susc.2007.11.004 | [Y] - BIXLER D L ET AL, "Low-energy, electron-spin-polarized 4He+ ion source", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, AIP, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19980501), vol. 69, no. 5, doi:10.1063/1.1148890, ISSN 0034-6748, pages 2012 - 2016, XP012036567 [Y] 1-30 * page 2012 - page 2013; figure 1 * * page 2015, column r * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1148890 | [YD] - L. D. SCHEARER ET AL, "Enhanced polarization of electron spins in 4He by simultaneous optical pumping with circularly and linearly polarized resonance radiation", PHYSICAL REVIEW A (ATOMIC, MOLECULAR, AND OPTICAL PHYSICS), USA, (19901001), vol. 42, no. 7, doi:10.1103/PhysRevA.42.4028, ISSN 1050-2947, pages 4028 - 4031, XP055270019 [YD] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevA.42.4028 | [A] - D. L. BIXLER ET AL, "Spin-dependent studies of the dynamics of He+ ion neutralization at a Au(100) surface", PHYSICAL REVIEW, B. CONDENSED MATTER., US, (19990901), vol. 60, no. 12, doi:10.1103/PhysRevB.60.9082, ISSN 0163-1829, pages 9082 - 9089, XP055269959 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevB.60.9082 | [A] - F. D. COLEGROVE ET AL, "Optical Pumping of Helium in the 3S1 Metastable State", PHYSICAL REVIEW, US, (19600701), vol. 119, no. 2, doi:10.1103/PhysRev.119.680, ISSN 0031-899X, pages 680 - 690, XP055270171 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRev.119.680 | [A] - L. D. SCHEARER, "Ion Polarization Via Penning Collisions with Optically Pumped Metastable Helium", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, US, (19690301), vol. 22, no. 13, doi:10.1103/PhysRevLett.22.629, ISSN 0031-9007, pages 629 - 631, XP055270164 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.22.629 | [A] - ARIANER J ET AL, "A flowing afterglow as a polarized electron source", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS, AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, ELSEVIER BV * NORTH-HOLLAND, NL, (19961121), vol. 382, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0168-9002(96)00800-5, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 371 - 378, XP004015880 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9002(96)00800-5 | [A] - NAKAJIMA TAKASHI ET AL, "Simultaneous production of spin-polarized ions/electrons based on two-photon ionization of laser-ablated metallic atoms", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, A I P PUBLISHING LLC, US, (20030915), vol. 83, no. 11, doi:10.1063/1.1610800, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 2103 - 2105, XP012035069 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1610800 | International search | [A]JP2005259476 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO); | [A] - BIXER D.L. ET AL., "Improved low-energy electron-spin-polarized 4He+ ion source", REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, (199901), vol. 70, no. 1, pages 240 - 241, XP012036892 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1149572 | by applicant | - L. D. SCHEARER, PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (1969), vol. 22, page 629 | - D. L. BIXLER, REVIEW OF SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, (1999), vol. 70, page 240 | - S. ESSABAA ET AL., NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, (1994), vol. A334, pages 315 - 318 | - L. D. SCHEARER ET AL., PHYSICAL REVIEW A, (19901001), vol. 42, no. 7, pages 4028 - 4031 | - C. G. SHULL ET AL., PHYSICAL REVIEW, (1951), vol. 84, page 912 | - MAKOTO IMADA; BUTSURI, MEMBERSHIP JOURNAL OF THE PHYSICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, (2000), vol. 55, page 20 | - P. D. JOHNSON ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, CONDENSED MATTER, (1998), vol. 10, page 95 | - M. ONELLION ET AL., PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (1984), vol. 52, page 380 | - D.P. SMITH, JOUNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (1967), vol. 38, page 340 | - W. HAPPER, REVIEW OF MODERN PHYSICS, (1972), vol. 44, page 169 | - M. AONO; R. SOUDA, JAPANESE JOUNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (1985), vol. 24, page 1249 | - TAKU SUZUKI, "Extended Abstracts of the 53rd Spring Meeting", THE JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS AND RELATED SOCIETIES, TOKYO, (2006), no. 2, page 782 | - R. SOUDA ET AL., SURFACE SCIENCE, (1987), vol. 179, page 199 |