EP2098232 - PERCUTANEOUS ABSORPTION PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | ||
For all designated states Eisai R&D Management Co., Ltd. 6-10, Koishikawa 4-chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 112-8088 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANATANI, Akinori NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
WASHIRO, Satoko NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
AKEMI, Hitoshi NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2013/23] |
Former [2009/37] | 01 /
HANATANI, Akinori NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | ||
02 /
WASHIRO, Satoko NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | |||
03 /
AKEMI, Hitoshi NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07832913.3 | 30.11.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007JP73248 | Priority number, date | JP20060325104 | 01.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006325104 | US20060861965P | 01.12.2006 Original published format: US 861965 P | [2009/37] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008066179 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2098232 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2098232 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, A61K9/70, A61K47/02, A61K47/14, A61K47/32, A61P25/28 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
A61K9/7061 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (KR);
A61K31/445 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/70 (KR);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61F2013/00646 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Extension states | AL | 28.05.2009 | BA | 28.05.2009 | HR | 28.05.2009 | MK | 28.05.2009 | RS | 28.05.2009 | Title | German: | ZUBEREITUNG MIT PERKUTANER ABSORPTION | [2009/37] | English: | PERCUTANEOUS ABSORPTION PREPARATION | [2009/37] | French: | PRÉPARATION D'ABSORPTION PERCUTANÉE | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2009 | Translation filed | 28.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 22.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2007 | AT | 05.06.2013 | CY | 05.06.2013 | CZ | 05.06.2013 | DK | 05.06.2013 | EE | 05.06.2013 | FI | 05.06.2013 | LT | 05.06.2013 | LV | 05.06.2013 | MC | 05.06.2013 | MT | 05.06.2013 | PL | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | SE | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | SK | 05.06.2013 | TR | 05.06.2013 | BG | 05.09.2013 | GR | 06.09.2013 | ES | 16.09.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | PT | 07.10.2013 | IE | 30.11.2013 | LU | 30.11.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 30.11.2007 | |
AT | 05.06.2013 | ||
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 30.11.2013 | ||
LU | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
TR | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CY | 05.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
IE | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
MC | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
DK | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
CZ | 05.06.2013 | ||
EE | 05.06.2013 | ||
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
SK | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
PT | 07.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
LV | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
PL | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
BG | 05.09.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
FI | 05.06.2013 | ||
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
SE | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
GR | 06.09.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.06.2013 | |
LT | 05.06.2013 | ||
ES | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 05.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1437130 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0020] - [0029] , [0033] , [0039] - [0041] - [0053] , [0059] - [0064]; examples 1-3; claims 1-13 *; | [A]EP1541177 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0024] , [0033] - [0035] - [0039]; claims 1-6; table 1 *; | [A]EP1086706 (EISAI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006070930 (EISAI CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | [A] - MORIEARTY P L ET AL, "Transdermal patch delivery of acetylcholinesterase inhibitors", METHODS AND FINDINGS IN EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, PROUS, BARCELONA, ES, (19930101), vol. 15, no. 6, ISSN 0379-0355, pages 407 - 412, XP009120198 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [AP]WO2007129712 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [AP]JP2007016019 (NITTO DENKO CORP, et al); | [Y]WO2006082728 (HISAMITSU PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2004010525 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [Y]JP2003062058 (NITTO DENKO CORP) | by applicant | JPH01315016 | WO03032960 | JP2003062058 | JP2004010525 | JPH11315016 | - Funtai-Riron to Oyo, MARUZEN, (19790512), page 55 |