EP2074782 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING CHANNEL NODE TREE IN AN OFDMA WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2009/27] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Hwan-Joon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | 02 /
YU, Jae-Chon Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Dong-Hee Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Jae-Hyun Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | 05 /
HAN, Jin-Kyu Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | [2009/27] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2009/27] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07833561.9 | 24.10.2007 | [2009/27] | WO2007KR05252 | Priority number, date | KR20060103721 | 24.10.2006 Original published format: KR 20060103721 | [2009/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008051020 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2074782 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26, H04L5/00, H04L5/02 | [2014/31] | CPC: |
H04L5/023 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0013 (KR);
H04L27/2602 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0007 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2009/27] | H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONFIGURIEREN EINES KANALKNOTENBAUMS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN OFDMA-KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2009/27] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONFIGURING CHANNEL NODE TREE IN AN OFDMA WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2009/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DESTINÉS À LA CONFIGURATION D'UN ARBRE DE NOEUDS DE CANAUX DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION OFDMA | [2009/27] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 16.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Downlink Channelization and Multiplexing for EUTRA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-050604, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20050616), vol. RAN WG1, no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20050616, XP050111419 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Physical Channel Structure and Procedure for EUTRA Downlink", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-050884-SAMSUNG-DL PHY CH STRUCTURE AND PROCEDURE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20050825), vol. RAN WG1, no. London, UK; 20050825, XP050100509 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Downlink Multiplexing for EUTRA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-051220-SAMSUNG-DL MULTIPLEXING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20051004), vol. RAN WG1, no. San Diego, USA; 20051004, XP050100818 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - SAMSUNG, "Text proposal on downlink channelization", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-060126-TP ON DL CHANNELIZATION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060119), vol. RAN WG1, no. Helsinki, Finland; 20060123, XP050417497 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [A] - NEC GROUP, "Resource Allocation Signalling for E-UTRA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-061308, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060502), vol. RAN WG1, no. Shanghai, China; 20060502, XP050102186 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US6804528 (LAROIA RAJIV [US], et al); | [A]KR20060037199 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |