EP2079965 - AIR CONDITIONER AND REVERSE PHASE DETECTION METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2018/28] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Min Soo 391-2 Gaeumjung-dong Changwon-si Kyungsangnam-do 641-110 / KR | [2018/28] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
KIM, Min Soo 391-2 Gaeumjung-dong Changwon-si Kyungsangnam-do 641-110 / KR | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2009/30] | Palmer, Jonathan R. Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07833911.6 | 07.11.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007KR05603 | Priority number, date | KR20060109567 | 07.11.2006 Original published format: KR 20060109567 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008056943 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2079965 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2079965 | Date: | 11.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/02, F24F11/00, G01R29/18 | [2018/08] | CPC: |
G01R29/18 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/49 (EP,KR,US);
F24F11/30 (EP,KR,US);
F25B2700/15 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/04] | F24F11/02, G01R31/02, F24F11/00, G01R29/18 | ||
Former IPC [2014/33] | F24F11/02, G01R31/02 | ||
Former IPC [2009/30] | F24F11/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/28] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMAANLAGE UND UMKEHRPHASENERKENNUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/30] | English: | AIR CONDITIONER AND REVERSE PHASE DETECTION METHOD THEREOF | [2009/30] | French: | CLIMATISEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE PHASE INVERSE | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 29.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.11.2007 | AT | 11.07.2018 | CY | 11.07.2018 | CZ | 11.07.2018 | DK | 11.07.2018 | EE | 11.07.2018 | ES | 11.07.2018 | FI | 11.07.2018 | IT | 11.07.2018 | LT | 11.07.2018 | LV | 11.07.2018 | MC | 11.07.2018 | NL | 11.07.2018 | PL | 11.07.2018 | PT | 11.07.2018 | RO | 11.07.2018 | SE | 11.07.2018 | SI | 11.07.2018 | SK | 11.07.2018 | TR | 11.07.2018 | BG | 11.10.2018 | GR | 12.10.2018 | GB | 07.11.2018 | IE | 07.11.2018 | LU | 07.11.2018 | MT | 07.11.2018 | IS | 11.11.2018 | BE | 30.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | FR | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.11.2007 | |
AT | 11.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PT | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
GB | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PT | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
GB | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
TR | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
GB | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
GB | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
GB | 07.11.2018 | ||
IE | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
BE | 30.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
FR | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IE | 07.11.2018 | ||
LU | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SI | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
LU | 07.11.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
MC | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
DK | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
EE | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
SK | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
CZ | 11.07.2018 | ||
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
RO | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
IT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
ES | 11.07.2018 | ||
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
LV | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 11.07.2018 | |
FI | 11.07.2018 | ||
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
PL | 11.07.2018 | ||
SE | 11.07.2018 | ||
BG | 11.10.2018 | ||
GR | 12.10.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 11.07.2018 | |
LT | 11.07.2018 | ||
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
IS | 11.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 11.07.2018 | |
NL | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 11.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US4060843 (BOST CHARLES H) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 39 - column 8, line 50; figures 1-6 * [A] 10-15; | [XA]JP2001091600 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-9 * abstract * [A] 10-15; | [XA]KR20020007668 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [A] 10-15; | [XA]JP2002262595 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [X] 1-9 * abstract * [A] 10-15; | [XA]JP2005003626 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-9 * abstract * [A] 10-15; | [XA]KR20050105645 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *[A] 10-15; | [XA]KR20050120266 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [A] 10-15; | [XA]JP2006174642 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-9 * abstract * [A] 10-15; | [XA] - ALFRED A REGOTTI ET AL, "Grounding and Relaying for Pipeline Pump Motor Protection", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRY APPLICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19780101), vol. 43, no. 1, ISSN 0093-9994, pages 27 - 32, XP011212647 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * [A] 10-15 | International search | [A]KR20020007668 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]JP2005003626 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]KR20050105645 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [A]KR20050120266 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US4060843 | JP2001091600 | KR20020007668 | JP2002262595 | JP2005003626 | KR20050105645 | KR20050120266 | JP2006174642 | - REGOTTI ET AL., "Grounding and Relaying for Pipeline Pump Motor Protection", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL APPLICATIONS, (197801), vol. 43, no. 1, pages 27 - 32, XP011212647 |