EP2165131 - REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2016/24] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul, 07336 / KR | ||
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Hyoung-Keun c/o LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 02 /
OH, Min-Kyu c/o LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 03 /
SONG, Gye-Young c/o LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Yang-Gyu c/o LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Nam-Gyo c/o LG Electronics Inc. Gasan R&D Campus 327-23 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-802 / KR | [2016/10] |
Former [2010/12] | 01 /
LIM, Hyoung-Keun 327-23 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | ||
02 /
OH, Min-Kyu 327-23 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | |||
03 /
SONG, Gye-Young 327-23 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Yang-Gyu 327-23 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | |||
05 /
LEE, Nam-Gyo 327-23 Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul 153-023 / KR | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [2016/24] |
Former [2013/20] | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/12] | TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07834227.6 | 22.11.2007 | [2010/12] | WO2007KR05927 | Priority number, date | KR20070051096 | 25.05.2007 Original published format: KR 20070051096 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008147000 | Date: | 04.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2165131 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2165131 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F25D19/00, F25D11/02, F25D17/06 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
F25D17/065 (EP,US);
F25D19/00 (KR);
F25D11/022 (EP,US);
F25D17/08 (KR);
F25D23/06 (KR);
F25D2317/062 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/12] | F25D19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/24] |
Former [2010/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KÜHLVORRICHTUNG | [2010/12] | English: | REFRIGERATOR | [2010/12] | French: | RÉFRIGÉRATEUR | [2010/12] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 18.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2007 | AT | 15.06.2016 | BE | 15.06.2016 | BG | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | CZ | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | ES | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | LV | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | NL | 15.06.2016 | PL | 15.06.2016 | RO | 15.06.2016 | SE | 15.06.2016 | SI | 15.06.2016 | SK | 15.06.2016 | TR | 15.06.2016 | GR | 16.09.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | IE | 22.11.2016 | MT | 22.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 22.11.2007 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
BG | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
TR | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 22.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 22.11.2007 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
TR | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 22.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 22.11.2007 | |
AT | 15.06.2016 | ||
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 22.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 22.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SI | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 15.06.2016 | |
BE | 15.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
ES | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 15.06.2016 | |
CZ | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
PL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
SK | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RO | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
SE | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
LV | 15.06.2016 | ||
GR | 16.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US4614092 (KIM DAL W [KR], et al) [X] 4 * column 2, line 67 - column 4, line 51 * * figures 1,4 * [A] 5 [Y] 7,8; | [Y]EP0881441 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 7,8 * figures 3,4 *; | [XAI]EP1174666 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD [JP]) [X] 4 * paragraphs [0049] , [0050]; figure 1 * [A] 5 [I] 6; | [XA]US5501084 (CHANG EUI-YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 4 * abstract * [A] 5; | [XA]US5191774 (PARK SUK HEANG [KR]) [X] 4 * figure 1 * [A] 5; | [XA]US2982115 (WURTZ CLIFFORD H, et al) [X] 4 * figure 1 * [A] 5; | [XA]US4044570 (ONO MINORU, et al) [X] 4 * figure 4 * [A] 5; | [XA]US3495416 (MORRISSEY WILLIAM M JR, et al) [X] 4 * figure 1 * [A] 5; | [XA]US3164970 (HUBACKER EARL F) [X] 4 * figure 1 * [A] 5; | [A]US2005217307 (KIM MOO Y [KR], et al) [A] 5 * figure 6 * | International search | [X]KR20000034756 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]JPH08189745 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPH10220948 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION); | [A]KR20050097185 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) |