EP2080414 - HEATING ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conflux AB P.O. Box 87 164 94 Kista / SE | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VON WACHENFELDT, Fredrik CONFLUX AB Box 87 164 94 Kista / SE | 02 /
MORTENSON, Per-Göran Mikael Vinstvägen 4, 5 tr 129 34 Hägersten / SE | 03 /
NYBERG, Gunnar Fasanstigen 8 183 51 Täby / SE | 04 /
NILSSON, Lars-Ove Rasholmsvägen 48 640 45 Kvicksund / SE | 05 /
SJÖSTRAND, Joachim Ballonggatan 8:402 169 71 Solna / SE | [2017/03] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
VON WACHENFELDT, Fredrik CONFLUX AB Box 87 164 94 Kista / SE | ||
02 /
MORTENSON, Per-Göran Mikael Vinstvägen 4, 5 tr 129 34 Hägersten / SE | |||
03 /
NYBERG, Gunnar Fasanstigen 8 183 51 Täby / SE | |||
04 /
NILSSON, Lars-Ove Rasholmsvägen 48 640 45 Kvicksund / SE | |||
05 /
SJÖSTRAND, Joachim Ballonggatan 8:402 169 71 Solna / SE | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2013/47] |
Former [2010/50] | Fritzon, Rolf, et al Kransell & Wennborg KB Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Axell, Kristina Albihns AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07835299.4 | 05.10.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007SE50714 | Priority number, date | SE20060002172 | 17.10.2006 Original published format: SE 0602172 | US20060829680P | 17.10.2006 Original published format: US 829680 P | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008048176 | Date: | 24.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080414 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2080414 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 24.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/14, H01C7/02 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
H05B3/28 (EP,US);
H05B3/146 (EP,SE,US);
H05B3/14 (KR);
H01C17/0652 (EP,US);
H01C17/06586 (EP,US);
H01C7/027 (EP,US);
H05B3/145 (EP,US);
H01C7/06 (EP,US);
H05B2203/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/30] | H05B3/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/03] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIZELEMENT | [2009/30] | English: | HEATING ELEMENT | [2009/30] | French: | ELEMENT CHAUFFANT | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 24.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2007 | AT | 18.01.2017 | CY | 18.01.2017 | CZ | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | PL | 18.01.2017 | RO | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | TR | 18.01.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | IE | 05.10.2017 | LU | 05.10.2017 | MT | 05.10.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 05.10.2007 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 05.10.2017 | ||
LU | 05.10.2017 | ||
MT | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.10.2007 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 05.10.2017 | ||
LU | 05.10.2017 | ||
MT | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
IE | 05.10.2017 | ||
LU | 05.10.2017 | ||
MT | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
LU | 05.10.2017 | ||
MT | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
LU | 05.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8903162 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]); | [X]EP0435574 (DAITO TSUSHINKI KK [JP]); | [X]US2002093007 (HANDA TOKUHIKO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]DE2543314 (RAYCHEM CORP); | [A]EP0435574 (DAITO TSUSHINKI KK [JP]); | [A]US5057674 (SMITH-JOHANNSEN ROBERT [NO]); | [A]US2002093007 (HANDA TOKUHIKO [JP], et al) | Examination | WO9117642 | by applicant | DE2543314 | US4177376 | US4330703 | US4543474 | US4654511 | WO8903162 | EP0435574 | US5057674 | US2002093007 |