EP2116006 - METHOD FOR REMOTELY CONTROLLING MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATION ACROSS LOCAL NETWORKS. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2018/26] |
Former [2009/46] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETERSSON, Justus Tegelviksgatan 38 S-116 41 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
GERDES, Martin Retzstr. 31 52156 Monschau-rohren / DE | 03 /
SKOG, Robert Gullvivegränd 7 S-165 76 Hässelby / SE | [2009/46] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2018/26] |
Former [2009/46] | Egrelius, Fredrik, et al Ericsson AB Patent Unit Service Layer & Multimedia Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07835364.6 | 25.10.2007 | [2009/46] | WO2007SE50780 | Priority number, date | US20070905001P | 05.03.2007 Original published format: US 905001 P | [2009/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008108699 | Date: | 12.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2116006 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2116006 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 12.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04M7/00, H04L29/08 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L65/1026 (EP,US);
H04L65/1036 (EP,US);
H04L65/1094 (EP);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/46] | H04L29/06, H04M7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2009/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FERNSTEUERUNG VON MULTIMEDIA-KOMMUNIKATION ÜBER LOKALE NETZE HINWEG | [2009/46] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOTELY CONTROLLING MULTIMEDIA COMMUNICATION ACROSS LOCAL NETWORKS. | [2009/46] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE À DISTANCE DES COMMUNICATIONS MULTIMÉDIAS À TRAVERS LES RÉSEAUX LOCAUX | [2009/46] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 25.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2007 | AT | 27.06.2018 | CY | 27.06.2018 | CZ | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | ES | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | IT | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | PL | 27.06.2018 | PT | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IE | 25.10.2018 | LU | 25.10.2018 | MT | 25.10.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 25.10.2007 | |
AT | 27.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IE | 25.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
MT | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IE | 25.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
MT | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IE | 25.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
MT | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IE | 25.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
MT | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IE | 25.10.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
LU | 25.10.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 27.06.2018 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006143295 (COSTA-REQUENA JOSE [FI], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XY]US2006168656 (STIRBU VLAD [FI]) [X] 1-3,5-9,13,14 * paragraphs [0003] , [0025]; figure 6 * [Y] 4,10-12,15; | [Y] - CAGENIUS T ET AL, "An IMS Gateway for Service Convergence in Connected Homes", INTERNET CITATION, (20060830), URL: http://www.fitce.org/paper/2006/815.pdf, (20070511), XP002433240 [Y] 4,10-12,15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO02093848 (VOCALTEC COMM LTD [IL], et al); | [A]WO2006012610 (CITRIX SYSTEMS INC [GB], et al); | [A]WO2006039941 (PIRELLI & C SPA [IT], et al); | [A]US2006114884 (REMAKER PHILLIP A [US]); | [A]WO2006115862 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2006045706 | WO2006079891 |