EP2089571 - A METHOD TO USE HEAT ENERGY FROM BLACK LIQUOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet Aktiebolag 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | [2014/25] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Metso Paper Sweden AB 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | ||
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Metso Fiber Karlstad AB Box 1033 651 15 Karlstad / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SNEKKENES, Vidar Dalbakkvägen 50 NO-0682 Oslo / NO | [2009/34] | Application number, filing date | 07835458.6 | 20.11.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007SE50875 | Priority number, date | SE20060002476 | 22.11.2006 Original published format: SE 0602476 | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008063127 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089571 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2089571 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D21C3/24, D21C3/22, D21C11/00 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
D21C3/22 (EP,US);
D21C11/0014 (EP,US);
D21C11/0028 (EP,US);
D21C3/24 (EP,SE,US);
Y02P70/10 (US)
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | D21C3/24, D21C3/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR NUTZUNG DER WÄRMEENERGIE DER SCHWARZLAUGE | [2009/34] | English: | A METHOD TO USE HEAT ENERGY FROM BLACK LIQUOR | [2009/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'ÉNERGIE THERMIQUE ISSUE DE LIQUEUR NOIRE | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 20.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 20.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.11.2007 | AT | 21.08.2013 | BE | 21.08.2013 | BG | 21.08.2013 | CY | 21.08.2013 | CZ | 21.08.2013 | DK | 21.08.2013 | EE | 21.08.2013 | ES | 21.08.2013 | IT | 21.08.2013 | LT | 21.08.2013 | LV | 21.08.2013 | MC | 21.08.2013 | MT | 21.08.2013 | NL | 21.08.2013 | PL | 21.08.2013 | RO | 21.08.2013 | SE | 21.08.2013 | SI | 21.08.2013 | SK | 21.08.2013 | TR | 21.08.2013 | IE | 20.11.2013 | LU | 20.11.2013 | GB | 21.11.2013 | GR | 22.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | FR | 02.12.2013 | IS | 21.12.2013 | PT | 23.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 20.11.2007 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
BG | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 20.11.2013 | ||
LU | 20.11.2013 | ||
GB | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
TR | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 20.11.2013 | ||
GB | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 20.11.2013 | ||
GB | 21.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
FR | 02.12.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
IE | 20.11.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
MC | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
ES | 21.08.2013 | ||
IT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
EE | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
SK | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
NL | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
RO | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
DK | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
CY | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
BE | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LV | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
SI | 21.08.2013 | ||
GR | 22.11.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
PL | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
AT | 21.08.2013 | ||
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
IS | 21.12.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 21.08.2013 | |
LT | 21.08.2013 | ||
SE | 21.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 21.08.2013 | |
PT | 23.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2014625 (MO OCH DOMSJOE AB) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5360514 (HENRICSON KAJ [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5415734 (BACKLUND AAKE [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9523891 (BELOIT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]WO9700997 (AHLSTROM MACHINERY OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US5788812 (AGAR RICHARD C [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9902771 (SUNDS DEFIBRATOR PORI OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4897157 (ELMORE CARL L [US], et al); | [A]WO9632531 (KAMYR INC [US]); | [A]US6176971 (SUN YU ELLA [SG], et al); | [A]US2005173081 (SNEKKENES VIDAR [SE], et al) |