EP2054765 - NON-LINEAR OPTICAL DEVICE SENSITIVE TO GREEN LASER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-1-2, Shimohozumi Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Michiharu 7820 Calle Lomas Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | [2009/22] |
Former [2009/19] | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Michiharu 3413 Calle Odessa Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2009/19] | Marshall, Caroline Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07836191.2 | 23.07.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007US16570 | Priority number, date | US20060833430P | 25.07.2006 Original published format: US 833430 P | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008013775 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2054765 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/0065, G11B7/24044, G02F1/361, G11B7/245, C08F220/34 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
G02F1/3617 (EP,US);
C08F220/34 (EP,US);
G11B7/0065 (EP,US);
G11B7/24044 (EP,US);
G11B7/245 (EP,US);
Y10S526/937 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/19] | G02F1/361, C08F226/00, G11B7/246 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEGENÜBER GRÜNEM LASER EMPFINDLICHE NICHTLINEARE OPTISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2009/19] | English: | NON-LINEAR OPTICAL DEVICE SENSITIVE TO GREEN LASER | [2009/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTIQUE NON LINÉAIRE SENSIBLE AU LASER VERT | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 16.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/28] | 01.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH10333195 ; | [X]JPH07318992 ; | [X]US5314939 (LEBARNY PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [DX]US6610809 (YAMAMOTO MICHIHARU [US], et al) [DX] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003181240 (NAGAO TORU [JP]) [A] 1-24* the whole document *; | [DX]US6653421 (YAMAMOTO MICHIHARU [US], et al) [DX] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004043301 (HIRAO AKIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005051758 (YAMAMOTO MICHIHARU [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005233246 (BODEN EUGENE [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 10, Database accession no. 1999-110160, XP002466177 & JPH10333195 A 19981218 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 07, Database accession no. 1996-062143, XP002466178 & JPH07318992 A 19951208 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - JAYAN THOMAS ET AL, "Bisarylamine polymer-based composites for photorefractive applications", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (2004), vol. 16, no. 22, pages 2032 - 2036, XP008087877 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.200400102 |