EP2050300 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING INTER-NETWORK HANDOVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/17] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLIVERA-HERNANDEZ, Ulises 2 Rolland Laniel Kirkland, Québec H9J 4A5 / CA | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Engdahl, Stefan Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Engdahl, Stefan AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/17] | Bergholtz Arkelius, Per Christian Awapatent AB Drottninggatan 89 P.O. Box 45086 S-104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 07836251.4 | 25.07.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007US16800 | Priority number, date | US20060820554P | 27.07.2006 Original published format: US 820554 P | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008013890 | Date: | 31.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2050300 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/18, // H04W36/14 | [2011/40] | CPC: |
H04W36/005 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/0016 (KR);
H04W36/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/34 (KR);
H04W4/18 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/14 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/19] | H04W4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/17] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG VON WEITERLEITUNGEN ZWISCHEN NETZWERKEN | [2009/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FACILITATING INTER-NETWORK HANDOVER | [2009/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR FACILITER LE TRANSFERT INTER-RÉSEAUX | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 13.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/46] | 29.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2005025182 (NAZARI ALA [SE]); |