EP2055004 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE CHANGE OF A SIGNAL, AND AN APPARATUS INCLUDING A CIRCUIT ARRANGED TO IMPLEMENT THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Technology Way Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Technology Way, P.O. Box 9106 Norwood, MA 02062-9106 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUERY, Alain, V. 10 Forbes Lane Andover, MA 01810 / US | 02 /
BREWER, Robert, John 22 Oxford Street Lambourn, Berkshire RG17 8XT / GB | 03 /
COLN, Michael, C., W. 21 Buckman Drive Lexington, MA 02421 / US | 04 /
LYDEN, Colin, Gerard The Cove Baltimore, Co. Cork / IE | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07837119.2 | 21.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007US18450 | Priority number, date | US20060839307P | 22.08.2006 Original published format: US 839307 P | US20070725261 | 19.03.2007 Original published format: US 725261 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008024327 | Date: | 28.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2055004 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2055004 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/08 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
G06F17/10 (EP,US);
H03M1/0626 (EP,US);
H03M1/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/37] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FESTLEGUNG EINES SIGNALWECHSELS UND VORRICHTUNG MIT SCHALTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG DIESES VERFAHRENS | [2009/19] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE CHANGE OF A SIGNAL, AND AN APPARATUS INCLUDING A CIRCUIT ARRANGED TO IMPLEMENT THE METHOD | [2009/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION D'UNE VARIATION D'UN SIGNAL, ET APPAREIL INCORPORANT UN CIRCUIT CONÇU POUR METTRE EN OEUVRE CE PROCÉDÉ | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 24.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6452996 (HSIEH JIANG [US]) [X] 1,17 * column 3, line 25 - column 5, line 9; figure 3; claim 1 * [A] 2-16,18-25; | [A]US5561667 (GERLACH KARL R [US]) [A] 1-25 * column 9, line 5 - column 10, line 46 *; | [A]WO2004034311 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-25 * page 14, line 19 - page 18, line 8; claim 1 * | [A] - BAIRD R T ET AL, "LINEARITY ENHANCEMENT OF MULTIBIT DELTA SIGMA A/D AND CONVERTERS USING DATA WIGHTED AVERAGING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS II: ANALOG AND DIGITAL SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19951201), vol. 42, no. 12, ISSN 1057-7130, pages 753 - 762, XP000553740 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/82.476173 | by applicant | EP1085469 | US6452996 |