EP2183914 - DIGITAL LIGHT PROCESSING ANTI-CAMCORDER SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2013 [2013/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULTZ, Mark, Alan 4437 Somerset Way S. Carmel, Indiana 46033 / US | [2010/19] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/19] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte, et al Thomson European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 07837139.0 | 21.08.2007 | [2010/19] | WO2007US18482 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009025639 | Date: | 26.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2183914 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/74, H04N9/31 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
H04N9/3182 (EP,US);
H04N9/3105 (EP,US);
H04N9/312 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/19] | Title | German: | DIGITALLICHTVERARBEITUNGS-ANTI-CAMCORDER-SCHALTER | [2010/19] | English: | DIGITAL LIGHT PROCESSING ANTI-CAMCORDER SWITCH | [2010/19] | French: | COMMUTATEUR ANTI-CAMÉSCOPE DE TRAITEMENT DE LUMIÈRE NUMÉRIQUE | [2010/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2010 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/19] | 27.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/13] | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2010 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.04.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 14.04.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.04.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1237369 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-22 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] , [0031] , [0077] , [0112] - [0118] - [0124] , [0129] , [0130] *; | [X]FR2890517 (THOMSON LICENSING SAS [FR]) [X] 1-22* the whole document * | Examination | JP2001078008 |