EP2067158 - MECHANICAL SWITCH WITH A CURVED BILAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, Avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | ||
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AKSYUK, Vladimir, Anatolyevich 585 Trinity Place, Unit N Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | 02 /
LOPEZ, Omar, Daniel 2048 Algonquin Drive Scotch Plains, NJ 07076 / US | 03 /
PARDO, Flavio 12 Ethan Drive New Providence, NJ 07974 / US | 04 /
SIMON, Maria, Elina 12 Ethan Drive New Providence, NJ 07974 / US | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Wetzel, Emmanuelle, et al Alcatel-Lucent Intellectual Property Business Group 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Wetzel, Emmanuelle, et al Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Intellectual Property & Corporate Standards Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/40] | Schmidt, Werner Karl Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/34] | Michalski, Stefan Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Intellectual Property & Standards Lorenzstrasse 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/24] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 07837367.7 | 27.08.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007US18812 | Priority number, date | US20060519623 | 12.09.2006 Original published format: US 519623 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008033213 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2067158 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2067158 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01H59/00 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
H01H59/0009 (EP,KR,US);
H01H2001/0042 (EP,KR,US);
H01H2059/0027 (KR);
Y10T29/49105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Title | German: | MECHANISCHER SCHALTER MIT GEKRÜMMTER DOPPELSCHICHT | [2009/24] | English: | MECHANICAL SWITCH WITH A CURVED BILAYER | [2009/24] | French: | COMMUTATEUR MÉCANIQUE À BICOUCHE COURBE | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.08.2007 | AT | 19.10.2011 | BE | 19.10.2011 | CY | 19.10.2011 | CZ | 19.10.2011 | DK | 19.10.2011 | EE | 19.10.2011 | FI | 19.10.2011 | IT | 19.10.2011 | LT | 19.10.2011 | LV | 19.10.2011 | MT | 19.10.2011 | NL | 19.10.2011 | PL | 19.10.2011 | RO | 19.10.2011 | SE | 19.10.2011 | SI | 19.10.2011 | SK | 19.10.2011 | TR | 19.10.2011 | BG | 19.01.2012 | GR | 20.01.2012 | ES | 30.01.2012 | IS | 19.02.2012 | PT | 20.02.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
TR | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
MT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
FI | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
ES | 30.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 19.10.2011 | |
BE | 19.10.2011 | ||
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
IT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
PL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
RO | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
SK | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
DK | 19.10.2011 | ||
EE | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
BG | 19.01.2012 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
CY | 19.10.2011 | ||
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
LV | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
SE | 19.10.2011 | ||
SI | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
NL | 19.10.2011 | ||
GR | 20.01.2012 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
PT | 20.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 19.10.2011 | |
LT | 19.10.2011 | ||
IS | 19.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 19.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5233459 (BOZLER CARL O [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [Y]US5619177 (JOHNSON A DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 4* figure 4 *; | [XY]WO9729538 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 4; | [X]EP1562207 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |