EP2057638 - DOWNHOLE CABLES WITH BOTH FIBER AND COPPER ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AFL Telecommunications LLC P.o. Box 3127 Spartanburg, South Carolina 29304-3127 / US | [2009/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERBST, Brian, G. 107 Ascot Court Easley, SC 29642 / US | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2009/20] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07837447.7 | 29.08.2007 | [2009/20] | WO2007US18926 | Priority number, date | US20060823959P | 30.08.2006 Original published format: US 823959 P | [2009/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008027387 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2057638 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2057638 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44, H01B7/04, H01B13/02 | [2015/38] | CPC: |
G02B6/4488 (EP,US);
H01B11/22 (US);
G02B6/032 (US);
G02B6/4416 (EP,US);
G02B6/443 (EP,US);
G02B6/4479 (US);
G02B6/449 (EP,US);
H01B1/026 (EP,US);
H01B13/02 (EP,US);
H01B7/046 (EP,US);
G02B2006/0325 (US);
Y10T29/49117 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49194 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/38] | G02B6/44 | ||
Former IPC [2009/20] | H01B1/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/10] |
Former [2009/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BOHRLOCHKABEL MIT FASER- UND KUPFERELEMENTEN | [2009/20] | English: | DOWNHOLE CABLES WITH BOTH FIBER AND COPPER ELEMENTS | [2009/20] | French: | CÂBLES DE FOND DE TROU POURVUS D'ÉLÉMENTS FIBREUX ET D'ÉLÉMENTS EN CUIVRE | [2009/20] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2008 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 29.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12157559.1 / EP2461197 | EP16159259.7 / EP3051324 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.08.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.02.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 29.02.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.03.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.11.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.08.2007 | AT | 09.03.2016 | BE | 09.03.2016 | CY | 09.03.2016 | CZ | 09.03.2016 | DK | 09.03.2016 | EE | 09.03.2016 | FI | 09.03.2016 | LT | 09.03.2016 | LV | 09.03.2016 | MC | 09.03.2016 | NL | 09.03.2016 | PL | 09.03.2016 | RO | 09.03.2016 | SE | 09.03.2016 | SI | 09.03.2016 | SK | 09.03.2016 | TR | 09.03.2016 | BG | 09.06.2016 | GR | 10.06.2016 | IS | 09.07.2016 | PT | 11.07.2016 | IE | 29.08.2016 | LU | 29.08.2016 | CH | 31.08.2016 | LI | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | [2018/33] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.08.2007 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
TR | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 29.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.08.2007 | |
AT | 09.03.2016 | ||
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CY | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 29.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
IE | 29.08.2016 | ||
LU | 29.08.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SI | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
MC | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
BG | 09.06.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
CH | 31.08.2016 | ||
LI | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
DK | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
BE | 09.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
PT | 11.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 09.03.2016 | |
CZ | 09.03.2016 | ||
EE | 09.03.2016 | ||
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
RO | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
SK | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 09.03.2016 | |
FI | 09.03.2016 | ||
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
IS | 09.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
NL | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
LV | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
SE | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
LT | 09.03.2016 | ||
PL | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 09.03.2016 | |
GR | 10.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB2240638 (TELEPHONE CABLES LTD [GB]); | [A]US5495547 (RAFIE SAEED [US], et al); | [XA]DE29520915U (ALCATEL KABEL AG [DE]); | [A]DE19603931 (ALCATEL IKO KABEL AB [SE]); | [A]WO9806109 (BICC PLC [GB], et al); | [A]EP0945876 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]); | [XA]WO0072071 (CIT ALCATEL [FR], et al); | [A]US6249629 (BRINGUIER ANNE G [US]); | [A]US2001032730 (GREGOR CARSTEN M [DE]) | International search | [A]US2147095 (MARTIN HOCHSTADTER); | [Y]US4087956 (GRE MICHEL JEAN); | [Y]US5493626 (SCHULTZ PHILIP K [US], et al); | [X]US5495547 (RAFIE SAEED [US], et al) | by applicant | GB2240638 |