EP2076254 - COMBINATION WITH BIS(THIOHYDRAZIDE AMIDES) FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Synta Pharmaceuticals Corp. 45 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2011/45] |
Former [2009/28] | For all designated states Synta Pharmaceuticals Corporation 45 Hartwell Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOYA, Keizo 234 Bonad Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | [2009/28] | Representative(s) | Snodin, Michael D., et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Snodin, Michael D., et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07837506.0 | 30.08.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007US19021 | Priority number, date | US20060841570P | 31.08.2006 Original published format: US 841570 P | [2009/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008027445 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2076254 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/16, A61K31/165, A61K31/337, A61K45/06, A61K41/00, A61P35/00 | [2009/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61K31/165 (EP,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K41/0052 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/165, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/16, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/337, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K41/0052, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Extension states | AL | 24.03.2009 | BA | 24.03.2009 | HR | 24.03.2009 | MK | 24.03.2009 | RS | 24.03.2009 | Title | German: | KOMBINATION MIT BIS(THIOHYDRAZIDAMIDEN) ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2009/28] | English: | COMBINATION WITH BIS(THIOHYDRAZIDE AMIDES) FOR TREATING CANCER | [2009/28] | French: | COMBINAISONS DE BIS(THIO-HYDRAZIDE AMIDES) TRAITANT LE CANCER | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 01.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/16] | 30.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO03006428 (SBR PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-50* abstract *; | [Y]WO2004064826 (SYNTA PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-50 * abstract * * page 19, line 14 - page 20, line 3; example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2006055747 (SYNTA PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al) [X] 21-50 * abstract * * page 14, line 12 - page 17, line 5 * * page 19, line 6 - line 12 * * page 20, line 27 - page 21, line 1 * * page 22, line 7 - line 13; claims 42,43,47-49 *; | [E]WO2008024299 (SYNTA PHARMACEUTICALS CORP [US], et al) [E] 21-50 * abstract * * page 11, line 12 - page 14, line 5 * * page 27, line 19 - line 24 * * page 79, line 16 - page 80, line 4; claim - *; | [E]WO2008024301 (SYNTA PHARMACEUTICAL CORP [US], et al) [E] 21-50 * abstract * * page 12, line 3 - page 15, line 4 * * page 28, line 13 - line 26 * * page 32, line 1 - line 4; claim - *; | [Y] - GEHRMANN MATHIAS, "Drug evaluation: STA-4783 - enhancing taxane efficacy by induction of Hsp70", CURRENT OPINION IN INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, PHARMAPRESS, US, (200606), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 1472-4472, pages 574 - 580, XP008087326 [Y] 1-50 * the whole document * | [Y] - The Merck Manual, MERCK RESEARCH LABORATORIES, (1999), XP002477370 [Y] 1-50 * page 987 - page 995 * * Principles of cancer therapy * | [Y] - WUST P ET AL, "Hyperthermia in combined treatment of cancer", LANCET ONCOLOGY, LANCET PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (200208), vol. 3, no. 8, ISSN 1470-2045, pages 487 - 497, XP004813895 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1470-2045(02)00818-5 |