EP2067218 - RARE EARTH DOPED OPTICAL FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, NY 14831 / US | [2019/21] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning NY 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAY, Stuart 370 East Second Street Corning, NY 14830 / US | 02 /
WALTON, Donnell, T. 122 Fieldview Drive Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 03 /
WANG, Ji 3412 Conhocton Road Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | 04 /
ZENTENO, Luis, A. 38 Katie Lane Painted Post, NY 14870 / US | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/21] | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2011/24] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2011/24] | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
Former [2009/24] | Boon, Graham Anthony Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07838743.8 | 24.09.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007US20597 | Priority number, date | US20060540099 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: US 540099 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008042143 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2067218 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2067218 | Date: | 22.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/067, H01S3/17, H01S3/16, H01S3/094, G02B6/036, G02B6/024, C03B37/014 | [2018/49] | CPC: |
C03B37/01413 (EP,US);
C03B37/01446 (EP,US);
G02B6/024 (EP,US);
H01S3/06716 (EP,US);
C03B2201/08 (EP,US);
C03B2201/31 (EP,US);
C03B2201/34 (EP,US);
C03B2201/36 (EP,US);
C03B2203/14 (EP,US);
C03B2203/22 (EP,US);
C03B2203/23 (EP,US);
C03B2203/30 (EP,US);
C03B2203/302 (EP,US);
C03B2205/10 (EP,US);
C03B2207/90 (EP,US);
G02B6/03633 (EP,US);
G02B6/03644 (EP,US);
H01S3/06712 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/24] | H01S3/067 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2019/21] |
Former [2009/24] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | SELTENERDDOTIERTE GLASFASER | [2009/24] | English: | RARE EARTH DOPED OPTICAL FIBER | [2009/24] | French: | FIBRE OPTIQUE DOPÉE AVEC DES TERRES RARES | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 04.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.10.2018 | 26.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.04.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 24.09.2019 | [2020/48] | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0041278 (CORNING INC [US]) [Y] 1-3,6 * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 26 * * page 0, lines 7,8 * * page 13, lines 11-21; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2005158006 (KOH JOOHYUN [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraphs [0016] , [0034] , [0052] - [0057]; figures 7-9; claim 4 *; | [Y]WO2005070843 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,3-8 * page 8, line 6 * * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] , [0031] - [0033] - [0042] - [0044] - [0046] - [0048]; figures 1,5,6,8,9; claims 1-10 *; | [A]US2006045446 (BERKEY GEORGE E [US], et al) [A] 1,2,13,15* paragraphs [0087] - [0090] - [0094] - [0098]; figures 11C,11D,15-21 *; | [Y]US2006088262 (BERKEY GEORGE E [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,7-16 * paragraphs [0060] - [0067] - [0070] , [0078] , [0079] , [0085] - [0090] - [0093] - [0096] - [0099] , [0101] - [0106]; figures 1A,1B,4,7,14-18 *; | [Y] - KURKOV A S ET AL, "Yb<3+>-doped double-clad fibers and lasers", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, VA , US, (20000101), vol. 4083, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 118 - 126, XP009115090 [Y] 1,2 * pages 118,119 * * pages 121,122; figures 2-5,7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.385638 |