EP1943555 - OPTICAL LOSS STRUCTURE INTEGRATED IN AN ILLUMINATION APPARATUS OF A DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/29] | OPTICAL LOSS STRUCTURE INTEGRATED IN AN ILLUMINATION APPARATUS | ||
[2008/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM MEMS Technologies, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/18] |
Former [2008/29] | For all designated states Qualcomm Mems Technologies, Inc. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BITA, Ion 65 Rio Robles East, Apt. 1204 San Jose, California 95134 / US | 02 /
XU, Gang 10092 Amador Oak Court Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 03 /
MIENKO, Marek 185 Estancia Drive, 316 San Jose, California 95134 / US | 04 /
GRUHLKE, Russell W. 1820 View Drive Milpitas, California 95035 / US | [2008/29] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Witte, Weller & Partner Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/29] | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Rotebühlstraße 121 D-70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07838811.3 | 24.09.2007 | [2008/29] | WO2007US20680 | Priority number, date | US20060850024P | 06.10.2006 Original published format: US 850024 P | [2008/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008045200 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1943555 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1943555 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F21V8/00 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
G02B6/0051 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0001 (KR);
G02B6/0065 (US);
F21S2/00 (KR);
G02B26/001 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0033 (EP,US);
G02B6/005 (KR);
G02B6/0053 (KR,US);
G02B6/0056 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/29] | G02B26/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/29] | Title | German: | OPTISCHE VERLUSTSTRUKTUR IN EINER BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/29] | English: | OPTICAL LOSS STRUCTURE INTEGRATED IN AN ILLUMINATION APPARATUS OF A DISPLAY | [2008/31] | French: | STRUCTURE D'AFFAIBLISSEMENT OPTIQUE INTÉGRÉE DANS UN APPAREIL D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2008/29] |
Former [2008/29] | OPTICAL LOSS STRUCTURE INTEGRATED IN AN ILLUMINATION APPARATUS | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/29] | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.10.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08152870.5 / EP2141408 | EP11160289.2 / EP2366942 | EP11160294.2 / EP2366943 | EP11160297.5 / EP2366944 | EP11160299.1 / EP2366945 | EP11160304.9 / EP2366946 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2007 | AT | 02.05.2012 | BE | 02.05.2012 | CY | 02.05.2012 | CZ | 02.05.2012 | DK | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | IT | 02.05.2012 | LT | 02.05.2012 | LV | 02.05.2012 | MT | 02.05.2012 | NL | 02.05.2012 | PL | 02.05.2012 | RO | 02.05.2012 | SE | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | SK | 02.05.2012 | TR | 02.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | GR | 03.08.2012 | ES | 13.08.2012 | IS | 02.09.2012 | PT | 03.09.2012 | IE | 24.09.2012 | LU | 24.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 01.10.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 24.09.2012 | ||
LU | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
TR | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
MT | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
IE | 24.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
ES | 13.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
IT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
RO | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SK | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
DK | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
NL | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.05.2012 | |
BE | 02.05.2012 | ||
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 02.05.2012 | |
CY | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
PT | 03.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
LV | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
GR | 03.08.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
PL | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 02.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | |
LT | 02.05.2012 | ||
SE | 02.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 02.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0957392 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-9,12,13,15,28,29,33,34,64-66 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0015] - [0023] , [0042] , [0051] - [0055] - [0059] - [0065] - [0072] - [0074] - [0083] , [0086] * * the whole document * [Y] 12-14,29-32; | [XY]US2002154256 (GOTOH TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,10,11,15-18,33,34,64-66 * abstract * * paragraphs [0053] , [0082] , [0105] , [0126] , [0141] , [0142] , [0146] - [0166]; table 2 * * the whole document * [Y] 12-14,29-32; | [X]EP1329664 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,9,15,33,64-66 * abstract * * paragraphs [0074] - [0078] - [0118] *; | [Y]US6879354 (SAWAYAMA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 12-14,29-32 * abstract * * column 45, line 10 - line 65 * * column 51, line 66 - column 52, line 25 * * column 54, line 40 - line 52 * * column 61, line 7 - line 13 *; | [XP]WO2007094558 (DOOSAN CORP [KR], et al) [XP] 1-8,15,28,64-66 * abstract ** paragraphs [0020] - [0025] - [0053] - [0059] * | Examination | US6852396 |