EP2092024 - SURFACE TREATED PIGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tronox LLC P.O. Box 268859 Oklahoma City OK 73126-8859 / US | [2010/51] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states Tronox LLC One Leadership Square, Suite 300 211 North Robinson Avenue Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7109 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RACHAL, Thomas W. 16304 Old Olive Way Edmond, OK 73013 / US | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | McCluskie, Gail Wilson J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | McCluskie, Gail Wilson J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07839675.1 | 18.10.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007US22255 | Priority number, date | US20060598309 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: US 598309 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008060386 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2092024 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2092024 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/21] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2092024 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/36, C09C3/08 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
C09C1/3669 (EP,US);
C09C3/08 (EP,US);
C01P2006/62 (EP,US);
C01P2006/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHLICH BEHANDELTES PIGMENT | [2009/35] | English: | SURFACE TREATED PIGMENT | [2009/35] | French: | PIGMENT À TRAITEMENT DE SURFACE | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 10.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.05.2011 | CY | 25.05.2011 | CZ | 25.05.2011 | DK | 25.05.2011 | EE | 25.05.2011 | HU | 25.05.2011 | LT | 25.05.2011 | LV | 25.05.2011 | MT | 25.05.2011 | PL | 25.05.2011 | RO | 25.05.2011 | SE | 25.05.2011 | SI | 25.05.2011 | SK | 25.05.2011 | TR | 25.05.2011 | BG | 25.08.2011 | GR | 26.08.2011 | IS | 25.09.2011 | PT | 26.09.2011 | IE | 18.10.2011 | LU | 18.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | FR | 02.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
TR | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
LU | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
BG | 25.08.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
LU | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
LU | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
MT | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 25.05.2011 | ||
DK | 25.05.2011 | ||
EE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
PL | 25.05.2011 | ||
RO | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
SK | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 25.05.2011 | |
CY | 25.05.2011 | ||
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
LV | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
SI | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
IS | 25.09.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 25.05.2011 | |
LT | 25.05.2011 | ||
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
GR | 26.08.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
SE | 25.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 25.05.2011 | |
PT | 26.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5476643 (FOGEL ARNOLD W [US]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [X]US2006042511 (CRAIG DANIEL H [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 4, paragraphs 52-56 * |