EP2086826 - SELF-PROPELLED VEHICLE PROPELLED BY AN ELLIPTICAL DRIVE TRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PT Motion Works, Inc. 207 N.Sierra Avenue, Unit A Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | [2013/32] |
Former [2010/16] | For all designated states PT Motion Works, Inc. 207 N.Sierra Avenue Unit A Solana Beach CA 92075 / US | ||
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states PT Motion Works, LLC 207 N. Sierra Avenue, Apt. A Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pate, Bryan 87 Quail Court Atherton, CA 94027 / US | 02 /
Teal, Brent 207 N. Sierra Avenue, Apt. A Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | [2009/33] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/33] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07840033.0 | 13.11.2007 | [2009/33] | WO2007US23837 | Priority number, date | US20060860570P | 21.11.2006 Original published format: US 860570 P | US20070899100 | 04.09.2007 Original published format: US 899100 | [2009/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008063499 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2086826 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2086826 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B62M1/14, B62M1/26, B62M1/28, B62K3/00 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
B62M1/26 (EP,US);
B62K3/002 (EP,US);
A63B22/205 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/37] | B62K3/00, B62M1/04 | ||
Former IPC [2010/42] | B62M1/04, B62K3/00 | ||
Former IPC [2009/33] | B62M1/04, B62M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/33] | Title | German: | VON EINEM ELLIPTISCHEN ANTRIEBSSTRANG ANGETRIEBENES SELBSTFAHRENDES FAHRZEUG | [2009/33] | English: | SELF-PROPELLED VEHICLE PROPELLED BY AN ELLIPTICAL DRIVE TRAIN | [2009/33] | French: | VEHICULE AUTOPROPULSE, PROPULSE PAR UN GROUPE MOTOPROPULSEUR ELLIPTIQUE | [2009/33] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 15.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/33] | 06.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13171240.8 / EP2647561 | EP13171302.6 / EP2650199 | EP13171304.2 / EP2650200 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.11.2007 | AT | 12.06.2013 | BE | 12.06.2013 | CY | 12.06.2013 | CZ | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | EE | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | IT | 12.06.2013 | LT | 12.06.2013 | LV | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | MT | 12.06.2013 | NL | 12.06.2013 | PL | 12.06.2013 | RO | 12.06.2013 | SE | 12.06.2013 | SI | 12.06.2013 | SK | 12.06.2013 | TR | 12.06.2013 | BG | 12.09.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | ES | 23.09.2013 | IS | 12.10.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | IE | 13.11.2013 | LU | 13.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 13.11.2007 | |
AT | 12.06.2013 | ||
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
TR | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
LU | 13.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
TR | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
IT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 12.06.2013 | |
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
ES | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 12.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003025293 (DREW WALTER BROOKS [US]) [X] 1-3,7,9,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0023] , [0024]; figure 1 *; | [XA]WO03022670 (MILLER LARRY D [US]) [X] 1-3,11 * page 6, line 5 - line 9 * [A] 12,13; | [X]US6485041 (JANSSEN DEAN R [US]) [X] 1-3,7,9,11 * column 6, line 16 - line 61; figures 5a,5b *; | [A]CA2434373 (CCS LLC [US]) [A] 13,14 * figures 13,14 *; | [A]US4666173 (GRAHAM GARNARD E [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5591107 (RODGERS JR ROBERT E [US]); | [A]JPH11263277 (SONY CORP); | [A]EP1281608 (WOHLGEMUTH HORST JOHANNES [DE]); | [X]US6663127 (MILLER LARRY [US]) |