EP2049631 - A LOW PHOSPHORUS LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITION HAVING LEAD CORROSION CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chevron Oronite Company LLC 6001 Bollinger Canyon Road, 3rd Floor San Ramon, CA 94583 / US | [2009/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOFFA, Alexander B. 5117 Harbord Drive Oakland, California 94618 / US | [2009/17] | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Nash, David Allan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2009/17] | Nash, David Allan, et al HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 07840789.7 | 08.08.2007 | [2009/17] | WO2007US75507 | Priority number, date | US20060463532 | 09.08.2006 Original published format: US 463532 | [2009/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008021901 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2049631 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2049631 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C10M137/10, // C10N10/04, C10N10/14, C10N30/12, C10N40/25 | [2011/37] | CPC: |
C10M137/10 (EP,US);
C10M169/04 (US);
C10M2207/026 (EP,US);
C10M2207/028 (EP,US);
C10M2215/064 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2219/044 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
C10N2020/04 (EP,US);
C10N2030/12 (EP,US);
C10N2030/42 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C10M2207/028, C10N2010/04 (US,EP);
C10M2223/045, C10N2010/04 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2009/17] | C10M133/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/37] |
Former [2009/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SCHMIERÖLZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT GERINGEM PHOSPHORANTEIL UND BLEIKORROSIONSKONTROLLE | [2009/17] | English: | A LOW PHOSPHORUS LUBRICATING OIL COMPOSITION HAVING LEAD CORROSION CONTROL | [2009/17] | French: | COMPOSITION D'HUILE LUBRIFIANTE DE FAIBLE TENEUR EN PHOSPHORE LIMITANT LA CORROSION DU PLOMB | [2009/17] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/17] | 10.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 28.06.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0435745 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* examples 1-7; claim 1 *; | [I]EP1403359 (INFINEUM INT LTD [GB]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0055] , [0079]; examples 1-5; table 4 * | International search | [Y]US3923669 (NEWINGHAM THOMAS D, et al); | [Y]US6596672 (CARRICK VIRGINIA A [US], et al); | [Y]US2004087451 (ROBY STEPHEN H [US], et al); | [A]US2004214730 (BUITRAGO JUAN ALBERTO [US]) |