EP2051954 - AZEOTROPIC OR AZEOTROPIC-LIKE COMPOSITIONS OF 1,1,1-TRIFLUOROETHANE AND 1-CHLORO-2,2,2-TRIFLUOROETHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COTTRELL, Stephen A. Honeywell International Inc Patent Services M\S - AB\2B P.O. Box 22445 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
PHAM, Hang T. 136 Larkspur Lane Amherst, New York 14228 / US | 03 /
SINGH, Rajiv R. 18 Foxfire Drive Getzville, New York 14068 / US | 04 /
TUNG, Hseuhsung 16 Vassar Drive Getzville, New York 14068 / US | [2012/11] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
COTTRELL, Stephen A. Honeywell International Inc, Patent Services M\S - AB\2B P.O. Box 22445 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | ||
02 /
PHAM, Hang T. 136 Larkspur Lane Amherst, New York 14228 / US | |||
03 /
SINGH, Rajiv R. 18 Foxfire Drive Getzville, New York 14068 / US | |||
04 /
TUNG, Hseuhsung 16 Vassar Drive Getzville, New York 14068 / US | |||
Former [2009/18] | 01 /
COTTRELL, Stephen A. 15142 Shenandoah Avenue Batton Rouge, Louisiana 70817 / US | ||
02 /
PHAM, Hang T. 136 Larkspur Lane Amherst, New York 14228 / US | |||
03 /
SINGH, Rajiv R. 18 Foxfire Drive Getzville, New York 14068 / US | |||
04 /
TUNG, Hseuhsung 16 Vassar Drive Getzville, New York 14068 / US | Representative(s) | Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2009/44] | Stewart, Lucy Caroline, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2009/18] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07840964.6 | 15.08.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007US75992 | Priority number, date | US20060506129 | 17.08.2006 Original published format: US 506129 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008022187 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2051954 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2051954 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/21, C07C17/386, C07C19/08, C07C19/12 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
C07C17/21 (EP,US);
C07C17/386 (EP,US);
C07C19/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C17/21, C07C19/08 (EP,US);
C07C17/386, C07C19/08 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/42] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AZEOTROPE ODER AZEOTROPENÄHNLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUS 1,1,1-TRIFLUORETHAN UND 1-CHLOR-2,2,2-TRIFLUORETHAN | [2009/18] | English: | AZEOTROPIC OR AZEOTROPIC-LIKE COMPOSITIONS OF 1,1,1-TRIFLUOROETHANE AND 1-CHLORO-2,2,2-TRIFLUOROETHANE | [2009/18] | French: | COMPOSITIONS AZÉOTROPES OU DE TYPE AZÉOTROPE DE 1,1,1-TRIFLUOROÉTHANE ET DE 1-CHLORO-2,2,2-TRIFLUOROÉTHANE | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 18.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5175379 (CREMER HANS R [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 7; example 8 *; | [A]WO2005097716 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1,11,22,33 * page 9, paragraph 20 ** page 11, paragraph 25; example 3 * |