EP2066398 - ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RIC Investments, LLC. 801 West Street, 2nd Floor Wilmington, DE 19801-1545 / US | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLBAUGH, Michael, E. 105 Kleylein Court Trafford, PA / US | 02 /
CLEGG, William 20096 Lynn Lane Gibsonia, PA / US | 03 /
SASS, Matthew 1001 Milton Avenue 2 Pittsburgh, PA / US | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | Verweij, Petronella Danielle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/24] | Schouten, Marcus Maria Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 07841643.5 | 30.08.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007US77278 | Priority number, date | US20060841802P | 01.09.2006 Original published format: US 841802 P | US20070846895 | 29.08.2007 Original published format: US 846895 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008028063 | Date: | 06.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2066398 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/18 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
A61N1/0456 (EP,US);
A61N1/048 (EP,US);
A61N1/0492 (EP,US);
A61N1/0541 (EP,US);
A61N1/3603 (EP,US);
A61N1/0488 (EP,US);
A61N1/0496 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENANORNDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [2009/24] | English: | ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF USING SAME | [2009/24] | French: | ENSEMBLE ÉLECTRODE ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 07.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.03.2013 | 05.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/37] | 06.05.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/37] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6077237 (CAMPBELL CRAIG [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9,10 * abstract * * columns 3,4 *; | [X]US2003195599 (BISHAY JON M [US]) [X] 1,2,4,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] - [0052] *; | [XI]US2003195585 (GRUZDOWICH GREGORY J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] *[I] 7,15; | [X]DE102005003735 (S P I SCIENCE PRODUCTION INTER [DE]) [X] 1,6,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0059] * | International search | [X]US2001031916 (BENNETT HENRY L [US], et al); | [X]US2004215236 (LATTNER STEFANIE [US], et al); | [Y]US2005171397 (BAUGH CARL E [US]) | by applicant | US6077237 | US2003195599 | US2003195585 | DE102005003735 |