EP2062103 - A SYSTEM FOR GAIN SCHEDULING CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2011 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2011 [2011/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07960 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. Law Department AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, New Jersey 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEWART, Gregory E. 3-229 East 8th Street North Vancouver, British Columbia V7L 2Y9 / CA | 02 /
BORRELLI, Francesco c/o Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services 101 Columbia Road AB-2B, P.O.Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962 / US | [2009/27] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
STEWART, Gregory E. 3-229 East 8th Street North Vancouver, British Columbia V7L 2Y9 / CA | ||
02 /
BORRELLI, Francesco 315 W. 15th Street Minneapolis, Minnesota 55403 / US | Representative(s) | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | Haley, Stephen Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07842211.0 | 11.09.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007US78107 | Priority number, date | US20060532081 | 14.09.2006 Original published format: US 532081 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008033800 | Date: | 20.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2062103 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G05B11/01, G05B11/32, G05B13/02 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
G05B13/024 (EP,US);
G05B13/042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG VON VERSTÄRKUNGSTERMINPLÄNEN | [2009/22] | English: | A SYSTEM FOR GAIN SCHEDULING CONTROL | [2009/22] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR LA COMMANDE DE PROGRAMMATION DE GAIN | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 13.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/11] | 29.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/11] | Divisional application(s) | EP10152423.9 / EP2196872 | EP10152424.7 / EP2196873 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6336322 (KUWABARA TAKAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * column 12, line 37 - line 67; figure 12 * [A] 5,6,8-10; | [PA]US2007142932 (STEWART GREGORY E [CA]) [PA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XA] - GRAY G J ET AL, "The application of genetic algorithms to gain-scheduling controller analysis and design", GENETIC ALGORITHMS IN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS: INNOVATIONS AND APPLICATIONS, 1997. GALESIA 97. SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON (CONF. PUBL. NO. 446) GLASGOW, UK 2-4 SEPT. 1997, LONDON, UK,IEE, UK, (19970902), ISBN 0-85296-693-8, pages 364 - 368, XP006503741 [X] 1-4,7 * the whole document * [A] 5,6,8-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/cp:19971207 | [PXA] - ZHENFU BI ET AL, "An Approach of PI Gain Scheduling with Hysteresis Switching for the Control of Boiler Drum Level in the Coal-Fired Power Generation Units", CONTROL APPLICATIONS, 2006 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PI, (200610), ISBN 0-7803-9795-9, pages 1517 - 1521, XP031011483 [PX] 1-4,7 * figure 2.2 * [A] 5,6,8-10 | [A] - JARED KRESGE, "Gain scheduled controller design effectiveness on a Non-minimum phase nonlinear plant", (20050506), URL: http://oak.cats.ohiou.edu/~jk310398/documents/ee890_2_homework_3.pdf, (20081103), XP002502318 [A] 3,4,7,9,10 * the whole document * | Examination | JPH06289904 | by applicant | US6336322 | - GRAY GJ ET AL., "The application of genetic algorithms to gain- scheduling controller analysis and design", GENETIC ALGORITHMS IN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, (19970902), pages 364 - 368 |