EP2089763 - INTERACTIVE DISPLAY USING PLANAR RADIATION GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2015/12] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states Microsoft Corporation One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATHICHE, Steven N. c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
SILVERSTEIN, Dana Lu c/o Microsoft Corporation International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07842860.4 | 20.09.2007 | [2009/34] | WO2007US78996 | Priority number, date | US20060549010 | 12.10.2006 Original published format: US 549010 | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008045665 | Date: | 17.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2089763 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.04.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/042, G02F1/13357, G02F1/1335, F21V8/00 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
G02B6/0046 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0425 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0051 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/0053 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1333 (KR);
G03B21/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | G02F1/13357, G02F1/1335, F21V8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Title | German: | INTERAKTIVE ANZEIGE MIT PLANARSTRAHLUNGSFÜHRUNG | [2009/34] | English: | INTERACTIVE DISPLAY USING PLANAR RADIATION GUIDE | [2009/34] | French: | AFFICHAGE INTERACTIF UTILISANT UN GUIDE DE RAYONNEMENT PLAN | [2009/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2009 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 06.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 23.04.2015 | 23.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.11.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/25] | 16.11.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/25] | 04.02.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.03.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0245413 (CAMBRIDGE 3D DISPLAY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 20 - page 4, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US2006158437 (BLYTHE MICHAEL M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10,11,15 * page 3, paragraph 40 - page 4, paragraph 47; figures 2B,5 * * page 7, paragraph 87 - paragraph 94 * [I] 3-6,9,12-14; | [A] - SOPHIE BOUAL 1 ET AL, "72.3: Wedge Displays as Cameras", SID 2006, 2006 SID INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, SOCIETY FOR INFORMATION DISPLAY, (20050524), vol. XXXVII, ISSN 0006-966X, pages 1999 - 2001, XP007012893 [A] 1-15 * figures 3,5 * | International search | [A]US2002008854 (LEIGH TRAVIS ADRIAN ROBERT [GB]); | [A]US2004196665 (TRAVIS ADRIAN ROGER LEIGH [GB]); | [A]JP2005195672 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]US2004046943 (MURAMATSU MASAHIRO [JP]) | Examination | US4484179 | US5025314 | WO2005026938 | WO2005057399 | US2005248848 | by applicant | US2006158437 |