EP2064605 - AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jadi, Inc. 5800 Crooks Road, 2nd Floor Troy, MI 48098 / US | [2009/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMID, Edzko 5800 Crooks Road, 2nd Floor Troy, MI 48098 / US | 02 /
FLECK, Paul 5800 Crooks Road, 2nd Floor Troy, MI 48098 / US | 03 /
CHEOK, Ka, C. 5800 Crooks Road, 2nd Floor Troy, MI 48098 / US | 04 /
STIGLICH, Tom 5800 Crooks Road, 2nd Floor Troy, MI 48098 / US | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Bawden, Peter Charles Bawden & Associates Rothamsted Enterprises Russell Building West Common Harpenden, Hertfordshire AL5 2JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Bawden, Peter Charles Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB | ||
Former [2009/23] | Bawden, Peter Charles Bawden & Associates 4 The Gatehouse 2 High Street Harpenden Hertfordshire AL5 2TH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07842871.1 | 20.09.2007 | [2009/23] | WO2007US79008 | Priority number, date | US20060826641P | 22.09.2006 Original published format: US 826641 P | US20070857700 | 19.09.2007 Original published format: US 857700 | [2009/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008036805 | Date: | 27.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2064605 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
G05D1/0278 (EP,US);
A63B2047/022 (EP,US);
G05D1/027 (EP,US);
G05D1/0272 (EP,US);
G05D1/0274 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUTONOME FAHRZEUGSTEUERUNG | [2009/23] | English: | AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE CONTROLLER | [2009/23] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE DE VÉHICULE AUTONOME | [2009/23] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 15.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/12] | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5400244 (WATANABE MUTSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * figure 22 * * column 5, lines 24-33 * * column 8, line 20 - column 9, line 18 *; | [XY]US2004158355 (HOLMQVIST HANS ROBERT [SE], et al) [X] 1 * figure 8 * * Abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0029] * [Y] 2-17; | [AD]US2005215269 (CHEOK KA C [US], et al) [AD] 1-17* the whole document *; | [Y] - KA C CHEOK, "Intelligent Autonomous Behavior Techniques for Small Unmanned Ground Vehicle Systems", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT SYSTEMS 2005, Kuala Lumpur 1-3 December 2005, (2005), XP007904008 [Y] 2-17 * pages 1-7 * |