EP2076176 - STEREOSCOPIC X-RAY SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kano, Bassel 10310 D'Auteuil Montreal QC H3L2K4 / CA | [2009/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/28] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07843839.7 | 04.10.2007 | [2009/28] | WO2007US80448 | Priority number, date | US20060539007 | 05.10.2006 Original published format: US 539007 | [2009/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008043020 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2076176 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/02, G21K4/00, G03C9/00, H05G1/02 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
A61B6/022 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/28] | A61B6/02, G21K4/00, G03C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/28] | Title | German: | STEREOSKOPISCHES RÖNTGENSTRAHLSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2009/28] | English: | STEREOSCOPIC X-RAY SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2009/28] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ STÉRÉOSCOPIQUES AUX RAYONS X | [2009/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.04.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/28] | 02.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/50] | 27.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/50] | 25.07.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2730566 (BARTOW JOHN B, et al) [X] 1,7-9,11,12,14 * column 1, lines 25-27 * * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 69; figures 11,13 * [Y] 6,16 [I] 2,3,5,10; | [XYI]US4696022 (SASHIN DONALD [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,11-15,17 * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 16; figures 1,2 * * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 9; figure 8 * [Y] 6,16 [I] 10; | [Y]US6181768 (BERLINER LEONARD F [US]) [Y] 6,16* lines 33-44 - column 3; figure 1 * | International search | [X]US2005207529 (BOESE JAN [DE], et al) | Examination | GB2005911 | GB2084440 | US4737972 | DE4130039 | US6055013 | - SEAN CAPTAIN, "Sharp Ships Notebook With 3D Screen", PC-WORLD, (20031013), XP055030862 |