EP2080027 - METHODS FOR THE DETECTION AND DIAGNOSIS OF TRYPANOSOMA CRUZI INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAH, Dinesh O 1408 Juliet Lane Libertyville, Illinois 60048 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Chi-Deu 2144 Kenton Lane Green Oaks, Illinois 60048 / US | 03 /
SCHOCHETMAN, Gerald 2508 Buckland Lane Northbrook, Illinois 60062 / US | 04 /
CHENG, Kevin Y 105 Windsor Place Mundelein, Illinois 60060 / US | [2009/34] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
SHAH, Dinesh O 1048 Juliet Lane Libertyville, Illinois 60048 / US | ||
02 /
CHANG, Chi-Deu 2144 Kenton Lane Green Oaks, Illinois 60048 / US | |||
03 /
SCHOCHETMAN, Gerald 2508 Buckland Lane Northbrook, Illinois 60062 / US | |||
04 /
CHENG, Kevin Y 105 Windsor Place Mundelein, Illinois 60060 / US | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07844370.2 | 18.10.2007 | [2009/30] | WO2007US81735 | Priority number, date | US20060583203 | 19.10.2006 Original published format: US 583203 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008051782 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080027 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2080027 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/553 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
G01N33/56905 (EP,US);
G01N33/543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Extension states | AL | 18.05.2009 | BA | 18.05.2009 | HR | 18.05.2009 | MK | 18.05.2009 | RS | 18.05.2009 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS UND ZUR DIAGNOSE EINER INFEKTION MIT TRYPANOSOMA CRUZI | [2009/30] | English: | METHODS FOR THE DETECTION AND DIAGNOSIS OF TRYPANOSOMA CRUZI INFECTION | [2009/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR LA DÉTECTION ET LE DIAGNOSTIC D'UNE INFECTION A TRYPANOSOMA CRUZI | [2009/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 31.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 20.05.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 20.05.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.10.2011 | BE | 12.10.2011 | CY | 12.10.2011 | CZ | 12.10.2011 | DK | 12.10.2011 | EE | 12.10.2011 | FI | 12.10.2011 | HU | 12.10.2011 | LT | 12.10.2011 | LV | 12.10.2011 | MT | 12.10.2011 | NL | 12.10.2011 | PL | 12.10.2011 | RO | 12.10.2011 | SE | 12.10.2011 | SI | 12.10.2011 | SK | 12.10.2011 | TR | 12.10.2011 | IE | 18.10.2011 | LU | 18.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | BG | 12.01.2012 | GR | 13.01.2012 | IS | 12.02.2012 | PT | 13.02.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
LU | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
LU | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
LU | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 12.10.2011 | ||
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 18.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 12.10.2011 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US6419933 (REED STEVEN G [US], et al); | [AD]US2004132077 (KIRCHHOFF LOUIS V [US], et al); | [PX] - CHENG KEVIN Y ET AL, "Immunoblot assay using recombinant antigens as a supplemental test to confirm the presence of antibodies to Trypanosoma cruzi", CLINICAL AND VACCINE IMMUNOLOGY, (200704), vol. 14, no. 4, ISSN 1556-6811, pages 355 - 361, XP002470337 [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/CVI.00401-06 | [A] - FERREIRA A W ET AL, "Enzyme-linked immunosorbent assay for serological diagnosis of Chagas' disease employing a Trypanosoma cruzi recombinant antigen that consists of four different peptides", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200112), vol. 39, no. 12, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 4390 - 4395, XP002470338 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.39.12.4390-4395.2001 | [A] - SAEZ-ALQUEZAR AMADEO ET AL, "Serological confirmation of Chagas' disease by a recombinant and peptide antigen line immunoassay: INNO-LIA Chagas", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (200002), vol. 38, no. 2, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 851 - 854, XP002470339 | Examination | - DA SILVEIRA JOSE FRANCO ET AL, "Chagas disease: Recombinant Trypanosoma cruzi antigens for serological diagnosis", TRENDS IN PARASITOLOGY, (200106), vol. 17, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/S1471-4922(01)01897-9, ISSN 1471-4922, pages 286 - 291, XP055211806 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1471-4922(01)01897-9 |