EP2082599 - SUBBAND ASSIGNMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/31] | DYNAMIC POWER AMPLIFIER BACKOFF USING HEADROOM INFORMATION | ||
[2015/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated Patent Department 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOROKHOV, Alexei 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
BORRAN, Mohammad J. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
AGRAWAL, Avneesh 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 04 /
BHUSHAN, Naga 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 05 /
KADOUS, Tamer 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 06 /
NAGUIB, Ayman F. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/47] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 07844650.7 | 26.10.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007US82740 | Priority number, date | US20060863118P | 26.10.2006 Original published format: US 863118 P | US20070923761 | 25.10.2007 Original published format: US 923761 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008052195 | Date: | 02.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2082599 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2082599 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/00 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
H04L5/0007 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W52/52 (KR);
H04W52/30 (US);
H04L5/0037 (EP,BR,US);
H04L5/0058 (EP,BR,US);
H04W52/04 (EP,BR,US);
H04W52/365 (KR);
H04W72/12 (KR);
H04W72/563 (EP,BR,US);
Y02B30/00 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/31] | H04Q7/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/47] |
Former [2009/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SUBBAND-ZUTEILUNG IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2015/42] | English: | SUBBAND ASSIGNMENT IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2015/42] | French: | ATTRIBUTION DE SOUS-BANDE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2015/42] |
Former [2009/31] | DYNAMISCHES BACKOFF FÜR EINEN LEISTUNGSVERSTÄRKER DURCH VERWENDUNG VON BAUHÖHENDATEN | ||
Former [2009/31] | DYNAMIC POWER AMPLIFIER BACKOFF USING HEADROOM INFORMATION | ||
Former [2009/31] | RÉDUCTION DYNAMIQUE DE LA PUISSANCE D'UN AMPLIFICATEUR UTILISANT DES INFORMATIONS D'ESPACE DE TÊTE | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 27.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.09.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 09.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11180457.1 / EP2448336 | EP15195036.7 Application refused : 01.04.2016 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2007 | AT | 18.11.2015 | BE | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | DK | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | ES | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | IT | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | NL | 18.11.2015 | PL | 18.11.2015 | PT | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | TR | 18.11.2015 | GR | 19.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 26.10.2007 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PT | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.10.2007 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.10.2007 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
BE | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
DK | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
ES | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
NL | 18.11.2015 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
IT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005111488 (SUBRAMANIAN VIJAY G [US], et al); | [XA]US2005272432 (JI TINGFANG [US], et al); |