EP2127115 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CELL SEARCH IN AN ORTHOGONAL WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
KIM, Byoung-hoon 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
MALLADI, Durga Prasad 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LUO, Tao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/35] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07844795.0 | 31.10.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007US83265 | Priority number, date | US20060863965P | 01.11.2006 Original published format: US 863965 P | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008057898 | Date: | 15.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2127115 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2127115 | Date: | 28.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
H04L5/0048 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
H04J11/0069 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
H04W48/16 (NO,US);
H04B1/7083 (KR);
H04L5/0023 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
H04L5/0037 (EP,BR,KR,NO,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/35] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZELLENSUCHE IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN ORTHOGONALKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2009/49] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CELL SEARCH IN AN ORTHOGONAL WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2009/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RECHERCHE DE CELLULE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ORTHOGONAL | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 04.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.08.2019 | EE | 28.08.2019 | LT | 28.08.2019 | LV | 28.08.2019 | MC | 28.08.2019 | MT | 28.08.2019 | SK | 28.08.2019 | LU | 31.10.2019 | BG | 28.11.2019 | IS | 28.12.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 28.08.2019 | |
EE | 28.08.2019 | ||
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
LU | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | EE | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
LU | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | EE | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
LU | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | EE | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
MC | 28.08.2019 | ||
SK | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | EE | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 28.08.2019 | |
LT | 28.08.2019 | ||
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | LT | 28.08.2019 | |
LV | 28.08.2019 | ||
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
IS | 28.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 28.08.2019 | |
BG | 28.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 28.08.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X] - HUAWEI, "Large sets of FH pilot patterns", Helsinki, Finland, no. R1060224, (20060123), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_AH_January-06/Docs/R1-060224.zip, (20080423), XP002480596 [X] 1-49 * Section 3.1 * * tables 1,2 * * 6.1.1.1 7.1.1.2.2 Downlink reference-signal structure * * figures 7.1.1.2.2-1 * | [A] - ERICSSON AB, "Downlink reference signals Discussion", no. R1-063008, (20061010), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_46bis/Docs/R1-063008.zip, (20080423), XP002480597 [A] 1-49 * the whole document * | [A] - LG ELECTRONICS, "LGE?s views on the various aspects of downlink reference signal design", Seoul Korea, no. R1-062561, (20061009), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_46bis/Docs/R1-062561.zip, (20080423), XP002480598 [A] 1-49 * Section 2 * * figure 1 * | [PX] - HUAWEI, "Frequency-shifting or frequency-hopping of DL reference symbols: implications to cell search and throughput performance", Riga, Latvia, no. R1-063032, (20061106), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_47/Docs/R1-063032.zip, (20080423), XP002480599 [PX] 1-49 * Sections 1 and 2 * | [PX] - HUAWEI, "Cell-specific integer sequences for frequency positioning of DL RS on subframe basis", Sorrento, Italy, no. R1-070532, (20070115), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_47bis/Docs/R1-070532.zip, (20080423), XP002480600 [PX] 1-49 * Sections 1,2 * |