EP2102380 - AMORPHOUS METAL FORMULATIONS AND STRUCTURED COATINGS FOR CORROSION AND WEAR RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lawrence Livermore National Security, LLC 7000 East Avenue Livermore CA 94551-9234 / US | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARMER, Joseph C. 1455 Yorkshire Loop Tracy, CA 94536 / US | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Galloway, Peter David, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Galloway, Peter David, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07844945.1 | 07.11.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007US83942 | Priority number, date | US20060598940 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: US 598940 | [2009/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008063891 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2102380 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C23C12/00, C22C45/00 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
C23C12/00 (EP,US);
C22C45/008 (EP,US);
C23C24/04 (EP,US);
C23C28/321 (EP,US);
C23C28/325 (EP,US);
C23C28/34 (EP,US);
C23C4/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | AMORPHES METALL ENTHALTENDE FORMULIERUNGEN UND STRUKTURIERTE BESCHICHTUNGEN FÜR KORROSIONSBESTÄNDIGKEIT UND VERSCHLEISSFESTIGKEIT | [2009/39] | English: | AMORPHOUS METAL FORMULATIONS AND STRUCTURED COATINGS FOR CORROSION AND WEAR RESISTANCE | [2009/39] | French: | PRODUITS À BASE DE MÉTAL AMORPHE ET REVÊTEMENTS STRUCTURÉS ASSURANT UNE BONNE RÉSISTANCE À LA CORROSION ET À L'USURE | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 01.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/15] | 09.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 30.11.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4613371 (CHENEY RICHARD F [US], et al) [X] 22-30* column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 24; example 1; claims 1-5 * |