EP2094077 - SPAT COLLECTION AND GROWING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Change - representative | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kvietelaitis, Peter 9 Boodera Court Clifton Springs, VIC 3222 / AU | [2009/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/36] | Representative(s) | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Isartorplatz 8 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Herzog, Martin KNH Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Neumann Herzog Fiesser Postfach 10 33 63 40024 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 07845332.1 | 07.12.2007 | [2009/36] | WO2007AU01890 | Priority number, date | AU2006906844P | 07.12.2006 Original published format: AU 2006906844 P | [2009/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008067612 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2094077 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 12.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01K61/00, A01K80/00 | [2009/36] | CPC: |
A01K61/54 (EP);
Y02A40/81 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/36] | Title | German: | SPAT-SAMMLUNGS- UND -ZÜCHTUNGSMEDIUM | [2009/36] | English: | SPAT COLLECTION AND GROWING MEDIUM | [2009/36] | French: | MILIEU DE COLLECTE ET DE CROISSANCE DE NAISSAIN | [2009/36] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 07.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 28.06.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/32] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2006002504 (GO DEEP INTERNAT INC [CA], et al); | [X]FR2554319 (LHONNEUR PIERRE [FR]); | [X]AU200222982 ; | [Y]US6520116 (JEFFERDS IAN W [US]); | [A]US5653193 (MARISSAL ERIC [FR]) |