EP2175105 - A CONTROLLING METHOD OF A GENERATOR SET PROVIDED WITH A BYPASS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Waigaoqiao No.3 Power Generation Co.Ltd No. 1281, Haixu Road Pudong Shanghai 200137 / CN | [2010/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Weizhong No. 101-2-1101, Rende Road Yangpu Shanghai 200434 / CN | [2016/45] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
FENG, Weizhong No. 101-2-1101, Rende Road Yangpu Shanghai 200434 / CN | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/45] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | ||
Former [2010/15] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Krenkelstrasse 3 01309 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07845794.2 | 03.12.2007 | [2010/15] | WO2007CN03432 | Priority number, date | CN20071041837 | 11.06.2007 Original published format: CN200710041837 | [2010/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008151485 | Date: | 18.12.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2175105 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2175105 | Date: | 09.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.12.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01D19/00, F01D15/10, F22B37/52, F22B37/22, F01K7/22, F01K13/02 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
F01K13/02 (EP);
F01K7/22 (EP);
F22B37/22 (EP);
F22B37/52 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/15] | F01D19/00, F01D15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/45] |
Former [2010/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STEUERVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN MIT EINEM BYPASSSYSTEM VERSEHENEN GENERATORSATZ | [2010/15] | English: | A CONTROLLING METHOD OF A GENERATOR SET PROVIDED WITH A BYPASS SYSTEM | [2010/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN ENSEMBLE GÉNÉRATEUR PRÉSENTANT UN SYSTÈME DE DÉRIVATION | [2010/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2010 | Translation filed | 11.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/15] | 16.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 01.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 11.01.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.03.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.12.2007 | AT | 09.11.2016 | BE | 09.11.2016 | CY | 09.11.2016 | CZ | 09.11.2016 | DK | 09.11.2016 | EE | 09.11.2016 | ES | 09.11.2016 | FI | 09.11.2016 | IT | 09.11.2016 | LT | 09.11.2016 | LV | 09.11.2016 | MC | 09.11.2016 | NL | 09.11.2016 | PL | 09.11.2016 | RO | 09.11.2016 | SE | 09.11.2016 | SI | 09.11.2016 | SK | 09.11.2016 | TR | 09.11.2016 | IE | 03.12.2016 | LU | 03.12.2016 | MT | 03.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 09.01.2017 | BG | 09.02.2017 | GB | 09.02.2017 | GR | 10.02.2017 | IS | 09.03.2017 | PT | 09.03.2017 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 03.12.2007 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
TR | 09.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
LU | 03.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 09.01.2017 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GB | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.12.2007 | |
AT | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CY | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
LU | 03.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 09.01.2017 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GB | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
LU | 03.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 09.01.2017 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GB | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SI | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
IE | 03.12.2016 | ||
LU | 03.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 09.01.2017 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
MC | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
BG | 09.02.2017 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
IT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
BE | 09.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
SK | 09.11.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
CZ | 09.11.2016 | ||
DK | 09.11.2016 | ||
EE | 09.11.2016 | ||
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
RO | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 09.11.2016 | |
ES | 09.11.2016 | ||
FI | 09.11.2016 | ||
LT | 09.11.2016 | ||
LV | 09.11.2016 | ||
NL | 09.11.2016 | ||
PL | 09.11.2016 | ||
SE | 09.11.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
GR | 10.02.2017 | ||
IS | 09.03.2017 | ||
PT | 09.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 09.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JP2002115805 (SAMSON CO LTD) [I] 1-7 * figure 2 * * abstract *; | [A]GB1309145 (FOSTER WHEELER BROWN BOILERS) [A] 1-7 * figure 2 * * page 2, line 102 - line 129 *; | [A]WO9106807 (AHLSTROEM OY [FI]) [A] 1-7 * figure 2 * * page 7, paragraph 4 *; | [A]JP2002277192 (KURITA ENG CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * figure 2 *; | [A]US2132732 (ISAAC GOLDBERG) [A] 1-7 * page 2 * | International search | [A]US4471446 (PODOLSKY LEAMAN B [US], et al); | [A]JPS59170410 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD); | [A]JPS60228710 (TOSHIBA KK); | [A]US4598551 (DIMITROFF JR VLADIMIR T [US], et al); | [A]CN87101723B ; | [A]JPH0337304 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [E]CN101096918 (SHANGHAI WAIGAOQIAO THIRD POWE [CN]); | [A] - FENG W., "Comprehensive prevention of steam oxidation and solid particle erosion for the ultra-supercritical unit", ELECTRIC POWER, (200701), vol. 40, no. 1, pages 69 - 73, XP008133537 | [A] - FENG W., "Functions and configuration of the bypass system for 1000 MW", ELECTRIC POWER, (200508), vol. 38, no. 8, pages 53 - 56, XP008133777 | [A] - ZHAO W., "Some measures for alleviating solid particle erosion in steam turbines", TURBINE TECHNOLOGY, (199108), vol. 33, no. 4, pages 38 - 40, XP008171693 | [A] - ZHAO W., "Some measures for alleviating solid particle erosion in steam turbines", JOURNAL OF ENGINEERING FOR THERMAL ENERGY AND POWER, (199201), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 14 - 17, XP008171692 |