EP2128975 - CONTROL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE MOTOR ROTOR POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Byd Company Limited Yan An Road, Kuichong, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518119 / CN | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Xiaohua Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | 02 /
YU, Ming Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Xuguang Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | 04 /
GONG, Jian Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Nan Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | 06 /
YANG, Guangming Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | 07 /
XU, Yingwu Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | 08 /
LUO, Ting Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | 09 /
LIU, Kai Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | 10 /
JIANG, Xianhong Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | 11 /
WU, Qiaoqiao Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | [2014/35] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
TANG, Xiaohua Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | ||
02 /
YU, Ming Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | |||
03 /
ZHOU, Xuguang Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | |||
04 /
GONG, Jian Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | |||
05 /
LIU, Nan Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | |||
06 /
YANG, Guangming Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | |||
07 /
XU, Yingwu Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | |||
08 /
LUO, Ting Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | |||
09 /
LIU, Kai Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | |||
10 /
JIANG, Xianhong Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | |||
11 /
WU, Qiaoqiao Yan An Road Kuichong Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518119 / CN | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/49] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07846028.4 | 05.12.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007CN71182 | Priority number, date | CN20061157298 | 05.12.2006 Original published format: CN200610157298 | CN2007176826 | 30.08.2007 Original published format: CN200710076826 | [2009/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008067769 | Date: | 12.06.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2128975 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2128975 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 12.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/16, G01D5/244, H02P25/02, H03M1/10, H02P29/02 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
H02P29/032 (EP,US);
H02P2203/05 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/49] | H02P6/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | STEUEREINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER ROTORLAGE EINES MOTORS | [2014/02] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE MOTOR ROTOR POSITION | [2009/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DE DÉTERMINATION DE LA POSITION DE ROTOR D'UN MOTEUR | [2009/49] |
Former [2009/49] | STEUEREINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER MOTOR-ROTORSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2009 | Translation filed | 18.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2009 | Search fee paid | 18.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 22.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.12.2007 | AT | 27.08.2014 | BE | 27.08.2014 | CY | 27.08.2014 | CZ | 27.08.2014 | DK | 27.08.2014 | EE | 27.08.2014 | ES | 27.08.2014 | FI | 27.08.2014 | IT | 27.08.2014 | LT | 27.08.2014 | LV | 27.08.2014 | MC | 27.08.2014 | MT | 27.08.2014 | NL | 27.08.2014 | PL | 27.08.2014 | RO | 27.08.2014 | SE | 27.08.2014 | SI | 27.08.2014 | SK | 27.08.2014 | TR | 27.08.2014 | BG | 27.11.2014 | GR | 28.11.2014 | IE | 05.12.2014 | LU | 05.12.2014 | IS | 27.12.2014 | PT | 29.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.12.2007 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 05.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 05.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 05.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 05.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 05.12.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
LU | 05.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 27.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XPA]EP1796257 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [XP] 1-3,6,7 * paragraphs [0061] , [0084] - [0086] - [0105] , [ 106] , [0122] , [0125]; figures 1,9-11,15-17 * [A] 4,5,8,9; | [XA]US2006125439 (AJIMA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,7 * paragraphs [0060] , [0115] , [0119] , [0124]; figures 2,14-16 * [A] 4,5,8,9 | International search | [A]CN1838523 (BYD CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1801596 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2002165482 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2000197383 (SWITCHED RELUCTANCE DRIVES LTD) | by applicant | EP1796257 | US2006125439 |