EP2122163 - WIND TURBINE WITH ROTOR BLADES EQUIPPED WITH WINGLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/48] | WIND TURBINE WITH ROTOR BLADES EQUIPPED WITH WINGLETS AND BLADES FOR SUCH ROTOR | ||
[2013/17] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2015/23] |
Former [2013/32] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | ||
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | ||
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Alsvej 21 8940 Randers - SV / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODSK, Kristian Balschmidt Heimdalsvej 5 8680 Ry / DK | 02 /
NIELSEN, Thomas Steiniche Bjertrup Vorup Kirkevej 31 8900 Randers / DK | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Inspicos P/S Agern Allé 24 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Inspicos A/S Kogle Allé 2 P.O. Box 45 2970 Hørsholm / DK | ||
Former [2009/48] | Schmidt, Jens Joergen, et al Patentgruppen A/S Arosgaarden Aaboulevarden 31 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 07846429.4 | 20.12.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007DK00559 | Priority number, date | DK20060001705 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: DK 200601705 | DK20070001142 | 10.08.2007 Original published format: DK 200701142 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008077403 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2122163 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2122163 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06, F03D11/00 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
F03D1/06 (EP,US);
F03D1/0608 (EP,US);
F05B2240/30 (US);
F05B2240/307 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US);
Y10S416/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | WINDTURBINE MIT MIT WINGLETS AUSGESTATTETEN ROTORSCHAUFELN | [2013/17] | English: | WIND TURBINE WITH ROTOR BLADES EQUIPPED WITH WINGLETS | [2013/17] | French: | ÉOLIENNE MUNIE DE PALES DE ROTOR ÉQUIPÉES D'AILETTES | [2013/17] |
Former [2009/48] | WINDTURBINE MIT MIT WINGLETS AUSGESTATTETEN ROTORSCHAUFELN UND SCHAUFELN FÜR SOLCH EINEN ROTOR | ||
Former [2009/48] | WIND TURBINE WITH ROTOR BLADES EQUIPPED WITH WINGLETS AND BLADES FOR SUCH ROTOR | ||
Former [2009/48] | ÉOLIENNE MUNIE DE PALES DE ROTOR ÉQUIPÉES D'AILETTES ET PALES POUR UN TEL ROTOR | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 08.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.05.2014
ADMISSIBLE LM WP PATENT HOLDING A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK Opponent's representative Hussey, Paul Anthony LM Wind Power A/S Jupitervej 6 6000 Kolding / DK | [2014/24] | 16.06.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 01.07.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2007 | AT | 07.08.2013 | BE | 07.08.2013 | BG | 07.08.2013 | CY | 07.08.2013 | CZ | 07.08.2013 | EE | 07.08.2013 | FI | 07.08.2013 | IT | 07.08.2013 | LT | 07.08.2013 | LV | 07.08.2013 | MC | 07.08.2013 | NL | 07.08.2013 | PL | 07.08.2013 | RO | 07.08.2013 | SE | 07.08.2013 | SI | 07.08.2013 | SK | 07.08.2013 | TR | 07.08.2013 | GR | 08.11.2013 | IS | 07.12.2013 | PT | 09.12.2013 | IE | 20.12.2013 | LU | 20.12.2013 | MT | 20.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | FR | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | ES | 21.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | [2020/33] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 20.12.2007 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
MT | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/07] | HU | 20.12.2007 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 20.12.2007 | |
AT | 07.08.2013 | ||
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
FR | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
IE | 20.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
LU | 20.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
BE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 07.08.2013 | |
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 07.08.2013 | |
PT | 09.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP1500814 (NATENCO NATURAL ENERGY CORP GM [DE]) [DA] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO2004061298 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [DA] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO2005078277 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [DA] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19963252 (SCHULZE LUTZ [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19738278 (HAFNER FELIX [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document * |