EP2092204 - ROLLING BEARING, IN PARTICULAR CENTRELESS LARGE ROLLING BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.09.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: NL | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states thyssenkrupp rothe erde Germany GmbH Tremoniastraße 5-11 44137 Dortmund / DE | [2020/49] |
Former [2014/09] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Rothe Erde GmbH Tremoniastraße 5-11 44137 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states Rothe Erde GmbH Tremoniastrasse 5-11 44137 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALZER, Thomas Singelers Garten 37 59437 Werl-Holtum / DE | 02 /
PALMER, Andreas Holunderweg 23a 59597 Erwitte / DE | 03 /
KAESLER, Andreas Hsperstr. 7a 59597 Erwitte / DE | [2009/36] |
Former [2009/35] | 01 /
MALZER, Thomas Steinergraben 74 59457 Werl / DE | ||
02 /
PALMER, Andreas Holunderweg 23a 59597 Erwitte / DE | |||
03 /
KAESLER, Andreas Hsperstr. 7a 59597 Erwitte / DE | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus, et al Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [2022/43] |
Former [2013/08] | Kirchner, Sven, et al ThyssenKrupp AG Patentabteilung ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2012/33] | Dahlkamp, Heinrich-Leo ThyssenKrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2009/35] | Dahlkamp, Heinrich-Leo Thyssen Krupp Technologies AG VRP Patente Am Thyssenhaus 1 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Dahlkamp, Heinrich-Leo ThyssenKrupp Technologies AG VRP Patente Am Thyssenhaus 1 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07846591.1 | 15.11.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007EP09859 | Priority number, date | DE20061054453 | 16.11.2006 Original published format: DE102006054453 | [2009/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008058729 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2092204 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2092204 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/33] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2092204 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16C19/38, F16C33/60 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
F16C19/381 (EP);
F16C19/505 (EP);
F16C33/585 (EP);
F16C33/60 (EP);
F16C2300/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/43] |
Former [2009/35] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WÄLZLAGER, INSBESONDERE MITTENFREIES GROSSWÄLZLAGER | [2009/35] | English: | ROLLING BEARING, IN PARTICULAR CENTRELESS LARGE ROLLING BEARING | [2009/35] | French: | ROULEMENT, NOTAMMENT ROULEMENT DE GRAND GABARIT SANS CENTRE | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 05.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.05.2013
31.05.2013
ADMISSIBLE Liebherr-Components Biberach GmbH Hans-Liebherr-Strasse 45 88400 Biberach/Riß / DE Opponent's representative Thoma, Michael, et al, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.05.2013
Liebherr-Components Biberach GmbH Hans-Liebherr-Strasse 45 88400 Biberach/Riß / DE Opponent's representative Thoma, Michael, et al, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | 21.06.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.12.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.09.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.02.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.02.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.09.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 04.04.2018 | Appeal received No. T0905/18 | 13.06.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.02.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 13.04.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 03.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | MT | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | IE | 15.11.2012 | LU | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | BE | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | AT | 15.11.2016 | CZ | 15.11.2016 | FI | 15.11.2016 | GB | 15.11.2016 | HU | 16.11.2016 | SI | 16.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | DK | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | BG | 08.08.2017 | [2024/14] |
Former [2023/35] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
LU | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
AT | 15.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2016 | ||
FI | 15.11.2016 | ||
GB | 15.11.2016 | ||
HU | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 08.08.2017 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
LU | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
AT | 15.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2016 | ||
FI | 15.11.2016 | ||
GB | 15.11.2016 | ||
HU | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
BG | 08.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
LU | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
AT | 15.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2016 | ||
FI | 15.11.2016 | ||
GB | 15.11.2016 | ||
HU | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
DK | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
LU | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
AT | 15.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2016 | ||
FI | 15.11.2016 | ||
HU | 16.11.2016 | ||
SI | 16.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
LU | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
IE | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/38] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
BE | 30.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 15.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [I]DE2634776 (KUGELFISCHER G SCHAEFER & CO) [I] 1* figure 3 *; | [DI]DE2647588 (HOESCH WERKE AG) [DI] 1 * figure 1 *; | [IA]EP0158015 (HOESCH AG [DE]) [I] 1,3-5 * figures 1,3,5,7 * [A] 2 | by applicant | DE2647588 | DE3034008 | EP0413119 | Opposition | DE1425038 | US4126361 | GB2083572 | EP0158015 | JPS6145496 | WO2008088213 |