EP2227416 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FUELLING AN AIRCRAFT TANK SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOHMANN, Jürgen Lachmannweg 15 22589 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
HINTZE, Jürgen Wittkoppel 19 22527 Hamburg / DE | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/37] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07846905.3 | 29.11.2007 | [2010/37] | WO2007EP10380 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009068066 | Date: | 04.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2227416 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2227416 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B67D7/32, B64F1/28 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
B64F1/28 (EP,US);
B67D7/3209 (EP,US);
G01F23/14 (US)
|
Former IPC [2010/37] | B64F1/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/37] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETANKEN EINES FLUGZEUGTANKSYSTEMS | [2010/37] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR FUELLING AN AIRCRAFT TANK SYSTEM | [2010/37] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'AVITAILLEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE RÉSERVOIR D'AÉRONEF | [2010/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 27.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2007 | AT | 27.06.2012 | BE | 27.06.2012 | CY | 27.06.2012 | CZ | 27.06.2012 | DK | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | IT | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | MT | 27.06.2012 | NL | 27.06.2012 | PL | 27.06.2012 | RO | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | TR | 27.06.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | ES | 08.10.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | IE | 29.11.2012 | LU | 29.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.11.2012 | ||
LU | 29.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
TR | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
MT | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
IT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
CY | 27.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 27.06.2012 | |
BE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06156599 (SHOWA AIRCRAFT IND) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE2339327 (NEUNZIG PETER) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]US3169667 (HEADRICK RICHARD T) [A] 1-12 * figure 1 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2007089491 (DUMORTIER LAURENT [FR] ET AL) [A] 3,4,14-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0093] , [0094] * |