EP2092696 - RESERVATION AND ADMISSION OF ACCESS RESOURCES FOR ACCESS SELECTION IN MULTI-ACCESS NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SACHS, Joachim Viktoriaallee 23 52066 Aachen / DE | 02 /
RINTA-AHO, Teemu Yläkartanonkuja 3 B 18 02360 Espoo / FI | 03 /
MAGNUSSON, Per Skogsgatan 51 587 23 Linköping / SE | 04 /
PRYTZ, Mikael Gustavslundsvägen 38 144 63 Rönninge / SE | [2009/35] | Representative(s) | Pfeifer, Torsten, et al Ericsson GmbH Patent Department Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Pfeifer, Torsten, et al Ericsson GmbH Ericsson Allee 1 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Application number, filing date | 07847166.1 | 14.11.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007EP62342 | Priority number, date | WO2006EP68529 | 15.11.2006 Original published format: PCT/EP2006/068529 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008058998 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2092696 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2092696 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
H04W28/16 (EP,US);
H04L47/12 (US);
H04L47/15 (EP,US);
H04L47/70 (US);
H04L47/72 (EP,US);
H04L47/788 (EP,US);
H04L47/822 (EP,US);
H04L47/824 (EP,US);
H04L47/828 (EP,US);
H04L47/83 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | RESERVIERUNG UND ZUGANGSBERECHTIGUNG FÜR RESSOURCEN ZUR ZUGANGSAUSWAHL IN MEHRFACHZUGANGSNETZEN | [2009/35] | English: | RESERVATION AND ADMISSION OF ACCESS RESOURCES FOR ACCESS SELECTION IN MULTI-ACCESS NETWORKS | [2009/35] | French: | RÉSERVATION ET ADMISSION DE RESSOURCES D'ACCÈS POUR UNE SÉLECTION D'ACCÈS DANS DES RÉSEAUX À MULTIPLES ACCÈS | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 02.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | BE | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | LT | 15.09.2010 | LV | 15.09.2010 | MT | 15.09.2010 | NL | 15.09.2010 | PL | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SE | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | IE | 14.11.2010 | LU | 14.11.2010 | FR | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | ES | 26.12.2010 | IS | 15.01.2011 | PT | 17.01.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/14] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 14.11.2010 | ||
LU | 14.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 14.11.2010 | ||
IT | 14.11.2010 | ||
LU | 14.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 14.11.2010 | ||
IT | 14.11.2010 | ||
LU | 14.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 14.11.2010 | ||
IT | 14.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 14.11.2010 | ||
IT | 14.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
MT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 14.11.2010 | ||
IT | 14.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 14.11.2010 | ||
IT | 14.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 14.11.2010 | ||
FR | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/28] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005060294 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-20* page 18, line 8 - line 22 *; | [A]WO2006028409 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract; page 9, line 17 - page 19, line 4; figures 1-5 *; | [XY] - GERBERT ET AL, "D 2.4 Multi-Radio Access Architecture", FRAMEWORK PROGRAMME, AMBIENT NETWORKS, XX, XX, (20051222), XP003001810 [X] 1,2,9,10,13,17,18 * Chapters 4.3.1, 4.4, 4.6, 5 * [Y] 3-8,11,12,14-16,19,20 | [Y] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); End-to-end Quality of Service (QoS) concept and architecture (3GPP TS 23.207 version 6.6.0 Release 6); ETSI TS 123 207", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200509), vol. 3-SA2, no. V660, ISSN 0000-0001, XP014032462 [Y] 3-8,11,12,14-16,19,20 * Annex D * |