EP2125943 - TREAD HAVING A COMPOSITION CONTAINING A GUAR GUM POWDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Technologie MICHELIN 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIDROT, Jean-Denis 15, rue Chateaubriand F-63400 Chamalieres / FR | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Cohen, Sylvia Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes - Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Cohen, Sylvia M.F.P. MICHELIN 23, place des Carmes Déchaux SGD/LG/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07847882.3 | 06.12.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007EP63395 | Priority number, date | FR20060011508 | 27.12.2006 Original published format: FR 0611508 | [2009/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008080750 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2125943 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2125943 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08L5/00, C08L9/00, B60C1/00 | [2010/27] | CPC: |
B60C1/00 (EP,US);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08L5/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L21/00, C08L2666/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/49] | C08K5/00, C08L9/00, B60C1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | LAUFFLÄCHE MIT EINER EIN GUARGUMMIPULVER ENTHALTENDEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2009/49] | English: | TREAD HAVING A COMPOSITION CONTAINING A GUAR GUM POWDER | [2009/49] | French: | BANDE DE ROULEMENT DONT LA COMPOSITION COMPORTE UNE POUDRE DE GOMME DE GUAR | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 23.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2011 | CY | 05.01.2011 | CZ | 05.01.2011 | DK | 05.01.2011 | EE | 05.01.2011 | FI | 05.01.2011 | HU | 05.01.2011 | IE | 05.01.2011 | IT | 05.01.2011 | LT | 05.01.2011 | LV | 05.01.2011 | MT | 05.01.2011 | NL | 05.01.2011 | PL | 05.01.2011 | RO | 05.01.2011 | SE | 05.01.2011 | SI | 05.01.2011 | SK | 05.01.2011 | TR | 05.01.2011 | BG | 05.04.2011 | GR | 06.04.2011 | ES | 16.04.2011 | IS | 05.05.2011 | PT | 05.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
MT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
TR | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
MT | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
IT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
RO | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
SK | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
DK | 05.01.2011 | ||
EE | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
IE | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 05.01.2011 | |
CY | 05.01.2011 | ||
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
NL | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 05.01.2011 | |
FI | 05.01.2011 | ||
LT | 05.01.2011 | ||
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
BG | 05.04.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 05.01.2011 | |
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
PL | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | LT | 05.01.2011 | |
LV | 05.01.2011 | ||
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
IS | 05.05.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | LT | 05.01.2011 | |
SE | 05.01.2011 | ||
SI | 05.01.2011 | ||
GR | 06.04.2011 | ||
ES | 16.04.2011 | ||
PT | 05.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0281252 (ALRON CHEMICAL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-20* the whole document * |