EP2102008 - DEVICES COMPRISING SEVERAL SPACED-APART STORAGE COMPARTMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAIST, Bernd Klaus Rosshirtstr. 2 97199 Ochsenfurt / DE | [2009/39] | Application number, filing date | 07847885.6 | 06.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007EP63398 | Priority number, date | DE20061061316 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: DE102006061316 | [2009/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008077730 | Date: | 03.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2102008 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2102008 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B41F27/12 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
B41F27/1206 (EP,US);
B41P2227/50 (EP,US);
B41P2227/62 (EP,US);
B41P2227/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN MIT MEHREREN JEWEILS IN EINEM ABSTAND ZUEINANDER ANGEORDNETEN SPEICHERFÄCHERN | [2009/39] | English: | DEVICES COMPRISING SEVERAL SPACED-APART STORAGE COMPARTMENTS | [2009/39] | French: | DISPOSITIFS COMPRENANT PLUSIEURS COMPARTIMENTS DE STOCKAGE SITUÉS RESPECTIVEMENT À DISTANCE LES UNS DES AUTRES | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 08.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2013 | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2007 | CY | 12.03.2014 | CZ | 12.03.2014 | DK | 12.03.2014 | EE | 12.03.2014 | ES | 12.03.2014 | FI | 12.03.2014 | IT | 12.03.2014 | LT | 12.03.2014 | LV | 12.03.2014 | MC | 12.03.2014 | MT | 12.03.2014 | NL | 12.03.2014 | PL | 12.03.2014 | RO | 12.03.2014 | SE | 12.03.2014 | SI | 12.03.2014 | SK | 12.03.2014 | TR | 12.03.2014 | BG | 12.06.2014 | GR | 13.06.2014 | IS | 12.07.2014 | PT | 14.07.2014 | AT | 06.12.2014 | IE | 06.12.2014 | LU | 06.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.12.2007 | |
CY | 12.03.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
TR | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
AT | 06.12.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
GR | 13.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
AT | 06.12.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
MC | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
AT | 06.12.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
AT | 06.12.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
IE | 06.12.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SI | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
LU | 06.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
IT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
DK | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
PT | 14.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
ES | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
NL | 12.03.2014 | ||
PL | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
SK | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
RO | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
IS | 12.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
CZ | 12.03.2014 | ||
EE | 12.03.2014 | ||
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
BG | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
LV | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 12.03.2014 | |
FI | 12.03.2014 | ||
LT | 12.03.2014 | ||
SE | 12.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO2004085157 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1,20 * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 10; figure - * * abstract * | by applicant | WO2004085157 | WO2004020202 | WO2005105444 |