EP2118611 - ASSEMBLY OF BAFFLES AND SEALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/47] | ASSEMBLY OF BAFFLES AND SEALS AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A HEAT EXCHANGER | ||
[2012/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMBAFFLE B.V. Lionsgate, A. Van Leewenhoekweg 38a10 2408 AN Alphen aan den Rijn / NL | [2013/09] |
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULDER, Dominicus Fredericus Badhuisweg 3 1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Ciceri, Fabio Perani & Partners Piazza San Babila, 5 20122 Milano / IT | [2013/09] |
Former [2009/47] | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 NL-2501 CJ The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 07848075.3 | 12.12.2007 | [2009/47] | WO2007EP63760 | Priority number, date | EP20060126093 | 14.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06126093 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008071725 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2118611 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2118611 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/22, F28F9/00, F28D7/16 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
F28F9/005 (EP,US);
F28D7/00 (KR);
F28D7/1607 (EP,US);
F28F9/22 (EP,KR,US);
F28F2009/224 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4935 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/47] | F28F9/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG VON PRALLFLÄCHEN UND DICHTUNGEN | [2012/45] | English: | ASSEMBLY OF BAFFLES AND SEALS | [2012/45] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE DÉFLECTEURS ET DE JOINTS D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ | [2012/45] |
Former [2009/47] | ANORDNUNG VON PRALLFLÄCHEN UND DICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES WÄRMETAUSCHERS | ||
Former [2009/47] | ASSEMBLY OF BAFFLES AND SEALS AND METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A HEAT EXCHANGER | ||
Former [2009/47] | ENSEMBLE DE DÉFLECTEURS ET DE JOINTS D'ÉTANCHÉITÉ ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN ÉCHANGEUR THERMIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 22.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 25.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.12.2007 | AT | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | CZ | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | EE | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | LT | 17.04.2013 | LV | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | MT | 17.04.2013 | PL | 17.04.2013 | RO | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | SI | 17.04.2013 | SK | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | IS | 17.08.2013 | IE | 12.12.2013 | LU | 12.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 12.12.2007 | |
AT | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
IE | 12.12.2013 | ||
LU | 12.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
TR | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
IE | 12.12.2013 | ||
LU | 12.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
IE | 12.12.2013 | ||
LU | 12.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
LU | 12.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
LU | 12.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
RO | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SK | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
EE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
LV | 17.04.2013 | ||
PL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
SI | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
LT | 17.04.2013 | ||
IS | 17.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 17.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]US1722109 (POTTER JOHN A) [X] 1-4,11 * figures 5-10 *; | [X]DE516682 (WEHRLE WERK A G) [X] 1,2,7,11,12 * page 2, line 27 - line 74; figure - *; | [XY]US1799471 (HAROLD LEACH CHARLES) [X] 1-3,11 * page 1, line 83 - page 2, line 29 * * page 2, line 75 - line 105; figure - * [Y] 5-9; | [X]US1962362 (REED CARL S) [X] 1,2 * page 1, line 109 - page 2, line 11; figure 2 *; | [X]GB1161768 (GOETAVERKEN AB [SE]) [X] 1,2,11 * sentence 89 - sentence 99; figure 6 *; | [Y]DE2442027 (STEINMUELLER GMBH L & C) [Y] 7-9 * page 3 - page 5; figure - *; | [Y]US4215745 (TUCKMANTEL HANS-JOACHIM [DE]) [Y] 5,6 * figure - *; | [PX]WO2006136567 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [PX] 1-13* figure -; claim - * |