EP2097306 - ROOM SERVICE TROLLEY FOR HOTELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CADDIE B.P no. 47 13, rue de la Mairie 67301 Schiltigheim / FR | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEPPEN-Joseph, Alice 13 rue de la Marie F-67300 Schiltigheim / FR | 02 /
LE MARCHAND, Alain 1 rue de Vendée F-67116 Reichstett / FR | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Laget, Jean-Loup Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Laget, Jean-Loup Brema-Loyer 161, rue de Courcelles 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07848290.8 | 26.09.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007FR01577 | Priority number, date | FR20060008649 | 03.10.2006 Original published format: FR 0608649 | [2009/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008040862 | Date: | 10.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2097306 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2097306 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B62B3/00, A47B31/00, A47B46/00 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
A47B31/00 (EP);
A47B46/00 (EP);
B62B3/004 (EP);
B62B3/02 (EP);
B62B2202/50 (EP);
B62B2202/66 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/37] | B62B3/00, A47B81/00, A47B31/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/37] | Title | German: | ZIMMERSERVICEWAGEN FÜR HOTELS | [2009/37] | English: | ROOM SERVICE TROLLEY FOR HOTELS | [2009/37] | French: | CHARIOT DE SERVICE DE CHAMBRE POUR LES HÔTELS | [2009/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 01.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.03.2010 | CZ | 10.03.2010 | DK | 10.03.2010 | EE | 10.03.2010 | FI | 10.03.2010 | IE | 10.03.2010 | LT | 10.03.2010 | LV | 10.03.2010 | MT | 10.03.2010 | PL | 10.03.2010 | RO | 10.03.2010 | SE | 10.03.2010 | SI | 10.03.2010 | SK | 10.03.2010 | TR | 10.03.2010 | BG | 10.06.2010 | GR | 11.06.2010 | IS | 10.07.2010 | HU | 11.09.2010 | LU | 26.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
MT | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
LU | 26.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
MT | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
HU | 11.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
MT | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
IT | 26.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
DK | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
FI | 10.03.2010 | ||
IE | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SE | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | FI | 10.03.2010 | |
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB1522774 (HANNEVIG A) [A] 1 * page 2, line 33 - line 70; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2519925 (MECHIN FILS SA ETS G [FR]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 15 - page 4, line 16; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2596717 (CADDIE ATEL REUNIS [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 34 - page 4, line 16; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]EP0901952 (VSI HOLDING AS [DK]) [A] 1* paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018]; figure 1 * | Examination | DE19524130 | US2002130598 | WO2008009933 |