EP2066894 - METHOD FOR OPTIMISING THE PERFORMANCE OF THE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE OF A VEHICLE, SUCH AS AN AUTOMOTIVE VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles Société Anonyme Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles Société Anonyme Route de Gisy 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARNIER, François 196 Avenue Roger Salengro F-92370 Chaville / FR | 02 /
MIQUEL, François Stablistrasse 11 CH-8006 Zurich / CH | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Ménès, Catherine PSA Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 18 rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Ménès, Catherine Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA PI (LG081) 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne-Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 07848354.2 | 20.09.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007FR51983 | Priority number, date | FR20060053995 | 28.09.2006 Original published format: FR 0653995 | [2009/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008037913 | Date: | 03.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2066894 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2066894 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02, F02N11/00 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
F02D41/0235 (EP);
F02D41/1447 (EP);
F02D41/22 (EP);
F02D2041/0265 (EP);
F02D41/2429 (EP);
F02D41/2441 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LEISTUNGSOPTIMIERUNG DES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS EINES FAHRZEUGES WIE ETWA EINES AUTOS | [2009/24] | English: | METHOD FOR OPTIMISING THE PERFORMANCE OF THE INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE OF A VEHICLE, SUCH AS AN AUTOMOTIVE VEHICLE | [2009/24] | French: | PROCEDE D'OPTIMISATION DES PERFORMANCES D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE D'UN VEHICULE, TEL QU'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 10.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | CZ | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | HU | 18.05.2011 | IE | 18.05.2011 | IT | 18.05.2011 | LT | 18.05.2011 | LV | 18.05.2011 | MT | 18.05.2011 | NL | 18.05.2011 | PL | 18.05.2011 | RO | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | TR | 18.05.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | ES | 29.08.2011 | IS | 18.09.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | LU | 20.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
TR | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
LU | 20.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
LU | 20.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
LU | 20.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
MT | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
IT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
IE | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
PL | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
NL | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
LV | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
IS | 18.09.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
LT | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
ES | 29.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 18.05.2011 | |
PT | 19.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4433631 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract ** column 2, line 66 - column 5, line 19 *; | [A]DE10128479 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0051] - [0060] *; | [A]WO02061261 (CUMMINS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 8, line 25 - page 10, line 12 *; | [A]WO03029634 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 30 * |