EP2127359 - CORRECTION OF NON-UNIFORMITY OF RESPONSE IN SENSOR ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermoteknix Systems Limited Teknix House 2 Pembroke Avenue Waterbeach, Cambridge CB25 9QR / GB | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAIRNDUFF, Bruce 2 Sternes Way Stapleford Cambridge CB22 5DA / GB | [2014/29] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
CAIRNDUFF, Bruce 2 Sternes Way Stapleford Cambridge CB22 5DA / GB | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2014/29] |
Former [2009/49] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07848682.6 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/49] | WO2007GB04962 | Priority number, date | GB20060025936 | 28.12.2006 Original published format: GB 0625936 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008081165 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2127359 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2127359 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2127359 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/217, H04N5/33, G01J5/20 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
G01J5/20 (EP,GB,US);
G01J5/026 (US);
G01J5/03 (EP);
H04N23/20 (EP,GB);
H04N25/00 (GB);
H04N25/671 (EP,US);
H04N5/33 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/34] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KORREKTUR VON UNGLEICHFÖRMIGKEIT DER ANTWORT IN SENSORARRAYS | [2009/49] | English: | CORRECTION OF NON-UNIFORMITY OF RESPONSE IN SENSOR ARRAYS | [2009/49] | French: | CORRECTION DE LA NON-UNIFORMITÉ D'UNE RÉPONSE DANS DES RÉSEAUX DE DÉTECTEUR | [2009/49] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 19.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2007 | AT | 16.07.2014 | CY | 16.07.2014 | CZ | 16.07.2014 | DK | 16.07.2014 | EE | 16.07.2014 | FI | 16.07.2014 | LT | 16.07.2014 | LV | 16.07.2014 | MC | 16.07.2014 | MT | 16.07.2014 | NL | 16.07.2014 | PL | 16.07.2014 | RO | 16.07.2014 | SI | 16.07.2014 | SK | 16.07.2014 | TR | 16.07.2014 | BG | 16.10.2014 | IS | 16.11.2014 | PT | 17.11.2014 | IE | 21.12.2014 | LU | 21.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.12.2007 | |
AT | 16.07.2014 | ||
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
TR | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
MC | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SI | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
EE | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
SK | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
DK | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
RO | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 16.07.2014 | |
CY | 16.07.2014 | ||
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
LV | 16.07.2014 | ||
NL | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
IS | 16.11.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 16.07.2014 | |
FI | 16.07.2014 | ||
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
PL | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
PT | 17.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
BG | 16.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 16.07.2014 | |
LT | 16.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 16.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0717560 (THOMSON CSF [FR]); | [Y]US6144408 (MACLEAN STEVEN D [US]); | [Y]US2003198400 (ALDERSON TIMOTHY [US], et al); | [Y]US2004135895 (WIEDMANN WOLFGANG [DE]); | [Y]US2005029453 (ALLEN THOMAS P [US], et al); | [Y]WO2006100662 (TNERSHIP SEMI CONDUCTOR DEVICE [IL], et al); | [DXY]EP1727359 (INFRARED SOLUTIONS INC [US]) |