EP2066282 - ION-TRIGGERABLE, WATER-DISINTEGRATABLE WET WIPE HAVING A SALT-STABLE EMULSIFIED WETTING COMPOSITION THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54957 / US | [2009/24] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54957-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIROVATKA, Kathryn 434 E.Apple Creek Road Appleton, WI 54913 / US | 02 /
CLARKE, Keisha 326 S.Karlyn Street Kimberly, WI54136 / US | 03 /
WENZEL, Scott 1310 Winter Wheat Drive Neenah, WI 54956 / US | 04 /
HUERTA, Jose 2130 W. Sophia Lane Appleton, WI 54913 / US | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
SIROVATKA, Kathryn 2125 Meadow Green Dr. Neenah, WI 54956 / US | ||
02 /
CLARKE, Keisha N307 Pinecrest Blvd. Appleton, WI 54915 / US | |||
03 /
WENZEL, Scott 1310 Winter Wheat Drive Neenah, WI 54956 / US | |||
04 /
HUERTA, Jose 2130 W. Sophia Lane Appleton, WI 54913 / US | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Beacham, Annabel Rose Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07849136.2 | 14.11.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007IB54639 | Priority number, date | US20060611616 | 15.12.2006 Original published format: US 611616 | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008075228 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2066282 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/02, A61K8/20, A61K8/27, A61K8/891, A61Q19/10 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
A61K8/0208 (EP,US);
A61K8/02 (KR);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/23 (EP,US);
A61K8/27 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/463 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2800/5426 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, GB, LI [2009/39] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERLÖSLICHES FEUCHTWISCHTUCH MIT IONENTRIGGERING UND MIT EINER SALZSTABILEN EMULGIERTEN BEFEUCHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2009/24] | English: | ION-TRIGGERABLE, WATER-DISINTEGRATABLE WET WIPE HAVING A SALT-STABLE EMULSIFIED WETTING COMPOSITION THEREIN | [2009/24] | French: | LINGETTE HUMIDE À DÉCLENCHEMENT IONIQUE POUVANT SE DÉSINTÉGRER DANS L'EAU CONTENANT UNE COMPOSITION HUMIDIFIANTE ÉMULSIFIÉE STABLE PAR RAPPORT AUX SELS | [2009/24] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/11] | 20.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002155281 (LANG FREDERICK J [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0002]; example -; claim -; table 19 *; | [X]US2003027470 (CHANG YIHUA [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * claim -; table - *; | [X]US2004063888 (BUNYARD W CLAYTON [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * claim -; table - * | Examination | US6001381 | WO9740814 | US5969038 |